AJ Holdings of Metairie, LLC v. BJ'S Jewelry & Loan, LLC et al
Plaintiff: AJ Holdings of Metairie, LLC
Defendant: BJ'S Jewelry & Loan, LLC, BJ's Jewelry & Loan of Metairie, LLC, BJ's Jewelry & Loan of Harvey, LLC, BJ's Jewelry & Loan of Kenner, LLC and Bradley Scott Johnson
Case Number: 2:2021cv00374
Filed: February 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Ivan LR Lemelle
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to BJ'S Jewelry & Loan, LLC on 3/1/2021, answer due 4/30/2021; BJ's Jewelry & Loan of Harvey, LLC on 3/1/2021, answer due 4/30/2021; BJ's Jewelry & Loan of Metairie, LLC on 3/1/2021, answer due 4/30/2021; Bradley Scott Johnson on 3/1/2021, answer due 4/30/2021. (Arbour, Tyler)
February 23, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to BJ'S Jewelry & Loan, LLC, BJ's Jewelry & Loan of Harvey, LLC, BJ's Jewelry & Loan of Kenner, LLC, BJ's Jewelry & Loan of Metairie, LLC, Bradley Scott Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(lt)
February 23, 2021 Filing 4 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #3 Request for Summons Issued. Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the Summons. The pdf should not have the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk took corrective action. (lt)
February 22, 2021 Filing 3 Request of Summons Issued as to BJ'S Jewelry & Loan, LLC filed by AJ Holdings of Metairie, LLC re #1 Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Arbour, Tyler) (Main Document 3 replaced on 2/23/2021) (lt). (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/23/2021) (lt). (Attachment 2 replaced on 2/23/2021) (lt). (Attachment 3 replaced on 2/23/2021) (lt). (Attachment 4 replaced on 2/23/2021) (lt).
February 22, 2021 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (ess)
February 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8744216) filed by AJ Holdings of Metairie, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Tyler John Arbour added to party AJ Holdings of Metairie, LLC(pty:selreq).(Arbour, Tyler)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AJ Holdings of Metairie, LLC v. BJ'S Jewelry & Loan, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BJ'S Jewelry & Loan, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BJ's Jewelry & Loan of Metairie, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BJ's Jewelry & Loan of Harvey, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BJ's Jewelry & Loan of Kenner, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley Scott Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AJ Holdings of Metairie, LLC
Represented By: Tyler John Arbour
Represented By: Ryan Michael Tucker
Represented By: Ashley L. Belleau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?