Payne-Dillon v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Donnika Payne-Dillon
Defendant: Comm. of SSA Andrew Saul and Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2021cv00532
Filed: March 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Ivan LR Lemelle
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Social Security Administration served on 4/9/2021, answer due 6/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Summons Executed on Attorney General of USA, Department of Justice, #2 Summons Executed on Office of Regional Chief Counsel, Region VI, SSA)(Chermol, David)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.2.5, David F. Chermol may participate pro hac vice in the above-captioned litigation as co-counsel for plaintiff. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 3/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Notice) (pp)
March 19, 2021 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice David F. Chermol (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8783312) by Donnika Payne-Dillon. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Bourgeois, Loyd) Modified text on 3/22/2021 (pp).
March 17, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, Attorney General of the United States, and United States Attorney's Office. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(lt)
March 16, 2021 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (aj)
March 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8775917) filed by Donnika Payne-Dillon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Office of General Counsel, #3 Summons United States Attorneys Office, #4 Summons United States Attorney General)Attorney Loyd J. Bourgeois, Jr added to party Donnika Payne-Dillon(pty:pla).(Bourgeois, Loyd) Modified text on 3/17/2021 (lt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Payne-Dillon v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comm. of SSA Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donnika Payne-Dillon
Represented By: Loyd J. Bourgeois, Jr.
Represented By: David F. Chermol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?