Punch v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Mr. Anthony Joseph Punch and Anthony Joseph Punch
Defendant: Comm. of SSA Andrew Saul and Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2021cv00541
Filed: March 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Nannette Jolivette Brown
Referring Judge: Dana Douglas
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Social Security Administration served on 4/23/2021, answer due 6/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Summons executed US ATTY served on 4/20/2021, answer due 6/21/2021, #2 Summons executed US AG served on 4/26/2021, answer due 6/25/2021)(Breuer, Wiebke) Modified text on 5/3/2021 (lt).
March 17, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, Attorney General of the United States, and United States Attorney's Office. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(lt)
March 17, 2021 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet Submitted (Breuer, Wiebke)
March 17, 2021 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (aj)
March 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8777605) filed by Anthony Joseph Punch. (Attachments: #1 Summons US Attorney, #2 Summons Attorney General US, #3 Summons SSA Commissioner)Attorney Wiebke Breuer added to party Anthony Joseph Punch(pty:pla).(Breuer, Wiebke) Modified text on 3/17/2021 (lt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Punch v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comm. of SSA Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Anthony Joseph Punch
Represented By: Wiebke Breuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Joseph Punch
Represented By: Wiebke Breuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?