Charles Schwab & Co Inc v. Spadoni
Plaintiff: Charles Schwab & Co Inc
Defendant: Kelyn Spadoni
Case Number: 2:2021cv00635
Filed: March 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Referring Judge: Jay C Zainey
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying without prejudice #4 Motion for Writ of of Sequestration. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey. (jrc)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting #9 Motion for Leave to Serve Third-Party Subpoenas. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any party receiving a subpoena served pursuant to this Order shall produce any documents, electronically stored information, or other tangible things responsive to the subpoena no later than fourteen (14) days from the date of service, unless written objections are provided to Schwab's counsel prior to that time or the parties specifically agree otherwise. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 4/5/2021. (ajn)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Michael R. Greco. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 4/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 NOTICE Pro Hac Vice Counsel) (ajn)
April 2, 2021 Filing 9 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Serve Third-Party Subpoenas by Charles Schwab & Co Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(London, William)
April 1, 2021 Filing 8 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice and Enroll as Additional Counsel of Record (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8800399) by Charles Schwab & Co Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing from Colorado Supreme Court, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Michael R. Greco, #3 Exhibit C - Completed and Signed E-Filing Consent Form, #4 Proposed Order)(London, William)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Expedited Discovery. ORDERED that Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. may immediately take the deposition of Defendant Kelyn Spadoni and serve no more than five (5) requests for production of document related to the subject matter of its Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Writ of Sequestration. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant shall produce written responses and objections along with the documents responsive to Plaintiff's requests for production no later than twenty-four hours prior to her deposition or at a time and place otherwise agreed upon in writing by the parties.. Signed by Judge Ivan L. R. Lemelle for Judge Jay C. Zainey. (jrc)
March 30, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Kelyn Spadoni. (ajn)
March 30, 2021 Filing 5 EXPARTE/CONSENT Emergency MOTION Expedited Discovery by Charles Schwab & Co Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(London, William)
March 30, 2021 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT Emergency MOTION for Writ of Sequestration by Charles Schwab & Co Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Writ of Sequestration)(London, William)
March 30, 2021 Filing 3 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Charles Schwab & Co Inc identifying Corporate Parent Charles Schwab Corporation for Charles Schwab & Co Inc (Attachments: #1 Second Copy of Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement)(London, William)
March 30, 2021 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (go)
March 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kelyn Spadoni (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8795259) filed by Charles Schwab & Co Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Spadoni's Schwab Individual Account Application, #2 Exhibit B - Schwab One Account Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - Screenshot of Schwab TOAR System re Feb. 24, 2021 Attempt to Reclaim Funds, #4 Exhibit D - Screenshot of Schwab TOAR System Stating Cash Not Available for Feb. 24, 2021 Reclaim Request, #5 Exhibit E - Screenshot of Schwab TOAR System re Mar. 3, 2021 Attempt to Reclaim Funds, #6 Exhibit F - Screenshot of Schwab TOAR System Stating Insufficient Funds for Mar. 3, 2021 Reclaim Request, #7 Exhibit G - Brett Thompson Emails to Spadoni, #8 Exhibit H - Text Messages from Schwab's Corporate Counsel to Spadoni, #9 Exhibit I - Mar. 23, 2021 Letter from Schwab to National Financial, #10 Exhibit J - Mar. 24, 2021 Letter from National Financial to Schwab, #11 Civil Cover Sheet, #12 Summons)Attorney William B. London added to party Charles Schwab & Co Inc(pty:pla).(London, William) (Attachment 11 replaced on 3/30/2021) (ajn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Charles Schwab & Co Inc v. Spadoni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelyn Spadoni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Schwab & Co Inc
Represented By: William B. London
Represented By: Michael R. Greco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?