Stallard v. Kelly et al
Plaintiff: Jean Markham Stallard
Defendant: John James Kelly, III, John James Kelly, Jr., kelly Family Trusts and Model Software Corporation
Case Number: 2:2021cv00677
Filed: April 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Nannette Jolivette Brown
Referring Judge: Dana Douglas
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal. Defendants John James Kelly III, John James Kelly Jr., Kelly Family Trusts, and Model Software Corporation are granted until 6/18/2021 to file responsive pleadings to the complaint filed by Plaintiff. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 5/26/2021. (jls)
May 19, 2021 Filing 10 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal by John James Kelly, III, John James Kelly, Jr, Kelly Family Trusts, Model Software Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Eric J. O'Bell added to party John James Kelly, III(pty:dft), Attorney Eric J. O'Bell added to party Kelly Family Trusts(pty:dft), Attorney Eric J. O'Bell added to party Model Software Corporation(pty:dft).(O'Bell, Eric) Modified text on 5/19/2021 (lt).
April 22, 2021 Filing 9 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #6 Request for Summons Issued. 1. Summons on incorrect sized paper. Local Rule 10.1E states 'All papers drafted for filing in this court shall be on 8-1/2 by 11 inch paper. Clerk has reduced images. No further action needed. 2. Multiple documents were incorrectly filed as one PDF. The Summons should have been filed as attachment(s) to the Request for Summons. All future filings should be entered this way. Clerk took corrective action. No further action is necessary. (bm)
April 22, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to John James Kelly, Jr. (bm) (Main Document 8 replaced on 4/22/2021) (bm).
April 22, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to John James Kelly, III, Kelly Family Trusts, Model Software Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(bm)
April 21, 2021 Filing 6 Request of Summons Issued as to John James Kelly, III, John James Kelly, Jr., Kelly Family Trusts, Model Software Corporation filed by Jean Markham Stallard re #1 Notice of Removal. (Michaud, Marc) (Main Document 6 replaced on 4/22/2021) (bm). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/22/2021: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (bm).
April 13, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Compliance by John James Kelly, Jr to #4 Directive Regarding Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(O'Bell, Eric) Modified event/text on 4/13/2021 (jls).
April 5, 2021 Filing 4 DIRECTIVE OF THE CLERK regarding compliance with 28 U.S.C. 1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal. Issued by the Clerk.(jls)
April 5, 2021 Filing 3 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal. **Civil Cover Sheet was not properly formatted and was submitted as a blank form. When using a form, please be sure to print the form to pdf prior to filing. PLEASE RE-FILE THE CORRECTED CIVIL COVER SHEET in pdf format using the event Civil Cover Sheet Submitted under Other Filings-Other Documents.** (jls)
April 1, 2021 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (go)
April 1, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, case number 2021-281 F (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8799997) filed by John James Kelly, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, State Court Petition, #2 Exhibit B. Notice of Filing, #3 Civil Cover Sheet - Blank)Attorney Eric J. O'Bell added to party John James Kelly, Jr(pty:selreq).(O'Bell, Eric) (Attachment 3 replaced to flatten image on 4/2/2021) (jls). Modified text on 4/2/2021 (jls).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stallard v. Kelly et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Markham Stallard
Represented By: Marc R. Michaud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John James Kelly, III
Represented By: Eric J. O'Bell
Represented By: Bradley T Oster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John James Kelly, Jr.
Represented By: Eric J. O'Bell
Represented By: Bradley T Oster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: kelly Family Trusts
Represented By: Eric J. O'Bell
Represented By: Bradley T Oster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Model Software Corporation
Represented By: Eric J. O'Bell
Represented By: Bradley T Oster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?