JTH Tax, LLC v. Johnson
Plaintiff: JTH Tax, LLC doing business as Liberty Tax Service
Defendant: Angel Johnson
Case Number: 2:2021cv00747
Filed: April 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Donna Phillips Currault
Referring Judge: Mary Ann Vial Lemmon
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 6/24/2021 at 10:30 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (sbs)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER AND REASONS granting #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 6/10/2021. (sbs)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion to Substitute Attorney. David M. McDonald be and is hereby substituted in place of Jacqueline C. Barber as counsel of record. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 6/2/2021. (pp) Modified text on 6/7/2021 (sbs).
June 1, 2021 Filing 21 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney David McDonald to be substituted in place of Jacqueline Barber by Angel Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Barber, Jacqueline)
May 25, 2021 Filing 20 Reply in Support filed by JTH Tax, LLC re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Comarda, Brian) Modified text on 5/26/2021 (sbs).
May 25, 2021 Filing 19 Reply in Opposition by Angel Johnson re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (Dahlen, Henry) Modified text on 5/26/2021 (sbs).
May 19, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE: Because R. Doc. #17 contains more than 50 pages, counsel shall deliver, within 3 working days, one hard copy of the submission in a binder as set forth in notice. Signed by Clerk.(sbs)
May 18, 2021 Filing 17 Supplemental Memorandum filed by JTH Tax, LLC, in Support of #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Comarda, Brian)
May 18, 2021 Filing 16 Supplemental Brief by Angel Johnson in Opposition of #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (Dahlen, Henry) Modified text, added link on 5/18/2021 (sbs).
May 10, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Angel Johnson.(Dahlen, Henry)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is CONTINUED as follows: counsel shall submit their supplemental memoranda by May 18, 2021, and reply briefs shall be submitted by May 25, 2021, at which time the court will take the matter under submission. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 5/4/2021.(sbs)
May 4, 2021 Filing 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon: Motion Hearing held on 5/4/2021 re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by JTH Tax, LLC. (Court Reporter Karen Ibos.) (sbs)
May 3, 2021 Filing 12 REPLY in Support filed by JTH Tax, LLC re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (sbs)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 5/3/2021. (sbs)
May 3, 2021 Filing 10 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction by JTH Tax, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading, #2 Proposed Order)(Comarda, Brian) Modified text on 5/3/2021 (sbs).
April 27, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Angel Johnson re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Barber, Jacqueline) Modified text on 4/28/2021 (cwa).
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record. IT IS ORDERED that Jacqueline C. Barber and Henry F. Dahlen be and are hereby enrolled as counsel of record for mover, Angel Johnson. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 4/27/2021. (sbs)
April 23, 2021 Filing 7 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record Jacqueline C. Barber and Henry F. Dahlen by Angel Johnson. Attorney Henry F Dahlen added to party Angel Johnson(pty:dft).(Dahlen, Henry) Modified text on 4/26/2021 (sbs).
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Preliminary Injunction Hearing scheduled for April 28, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. is continued to May 4, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. Opposition briefs are due by April 27, 2021. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 4/22/2021.(sbs)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a Preliminary Injunction hearing will be held on April 28, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. by Zoom. Opposition briefs are due April 21, 2021. Login information will be furnished by the Case Manager. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 4/14/2021.(sbs)
April 13, 2021 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by JTH Tax, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Proposed Order)(Comarda, Brian)
April 13, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Angel Johnson. (sbs)
April 13, 2021 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (go)
April 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Angel Johnson (Filing fee $402 receipt number ALAEDC-8814336) filed by JTH Tax, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Summons) Attorney Brian J. Comarda added to party JTH Tax, LLC(pty:pla).(Comarda, Brian) Modified text on 4/13/2021 (sbs). (Attachment 7 replaced on 4/13/2021) (sbs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JTH Tax, LLC v. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JTH Tax, LLC doing business as Liberty Tax Service
Represented By: Brian J. Comarda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angel Johnson
Represented By: Henry F Dahlen
Represented By: Jacqueline Claire Barber
Represented By: David M. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?