Jenkins v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Scott Dwayne Jenkins
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2021cv00786
Filed: April 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Mary Ann Vial Lemmon
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Social Security Administration served on 5/10/2021, answer due 7/9/2021. (Wicklund, Edward)
April 19, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Pauper Letter)(cg)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Edward A Wicklund. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas on 4/19/21. (cg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/19/2021: #1 Pro-Hac Vice Notice) (cg).
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas on 4/19/21. (cg)
April 19, 2021 Filing 4 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (aj)
April 17, 2021 Filing 3 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Edward A. Wicklund (Filing fee $100 receipt number ALAEDC-8821501) by Scott Dwayne Jenkins. Motion(s) referred to Dana M. Douglas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration, #3 Certificate of Good Standing)(Misko, Benjamin) Modified text, referred motion on 4/19/2021 (sbs).
April 17, 2021 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Scott Dwayne Jenkins. Motion(s) referred to Dana M. Douglas. (Attachments: #1 In Forma Pauperis, #2 Proposed Order)(Misko, Benjamin) Modified text, referred motion on 4/19/2021 (sbs).
April 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration (In Forma Pauperis status requested) filed by Scott Dwayne Jenkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Notice of Appeals Council Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons) Attorney Benjamin M. Misko added to party Scott Dwayne Jenkins(pty:pla).(Misko, Benjamin) Modified text on 4/19/2021 (sbs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jenkins v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Dwayne Jenkins
Represented By: Edward A Wicklund
Represented By: Benjamin M. Misko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?