Cooley v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Bryan M. Cooley
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Not Classified By Court: Comm. of SSA Andrew Saul
Case Number: 2:2021cv00840
Filed: April 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Martin LC Feldman
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. David F. Chermol is hereby enrolled on behalf of Bryan M. Cooley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 4/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Notice) (jls)
April 29, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(sa)
April 28, 2021 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Martin L.C. Feldman and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (aj)
April 28, 2021 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice David Chermol (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8836746) by Bryan M. Cooley. Motion referred to Judge Michael North. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit of David Chermol, #3 Exhibit EDLA Registration, #4 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Bourgeois, Loyd) Modified text/referral on 4/29/2021 (sa).
April 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Association (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8836732) filed by Bryan M. Cooley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Office of General Counsel, #3 Summons United States Attorney General, #4 Summons United States Attorney) Attorney Loyd J. Bourgeois, Jr added to party Bryan M. Cooley(pty:pla).(Bourgeois, Loyd) Modified text on 4/29/2021 (sa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooley v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Comm. of SSA Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan M. Cooley
Represented By: Loyd J. Bourgeois, Jr.
Represented By: David F. Chermol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?