Brumfield v. Attorney General State of Louisiana et al
Plaintiff: Marlone R Brumfield
Defendant: Darryl Vannoy
Respondent: Attorney General State of Louisiana
Case Number: 2:2021cv00870
Filed: April 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Greg Gerard Guidry
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
2 Judge: Sarah S Vance
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2021 Filing 16 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #15 SECOND MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254), #4 Habeas Corpus Response Order. **Filing attorney should have selected 'Yes' at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?'. Exparte/Consent Motions are not set for submission. Clerk modified docket text to reflect 'Exparte' and removed submission date.** (Reference: 21-870)(mm)
June 25, 2021 Filing 15 EXPARTE/CONSENT SECOND MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254), #4 Habeas Corpus Response Order by Darryl Vannoy. Motion(s) referred to Janis van Meerveld. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Notice of Submission)(Reference: 21-870)(Caplan, Matthew) Modified text/removed submission date on 6/25/2021 (mm).
June 25, 2021 Filing 14 DEFICIENT: SECOND MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254), 4 Habeas Corpus Response Order by Darryl Vannoy. Motion(s) referred to Janis van Meerveld. Motion(s) will be submitted on 7/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Notice of Submission)(Reference: 21-870)(Caplan, Matthew) Modified text on 6/25/2021 (mm).
June 23, 2021 Filing 13 Return of Service of H/C Response Order served on Attorney General's Office and St. Tammany Parish Clerk on 6/21/2021; St. Tammany Parish DA on 6/22/2021 (Attachments: #1 Green Card-St. Tammany Parish Clerk, #2 Green Card-St. Tammany Parish DA)(Reference: 21-898, document 12)(mm)
June 22, 2021 Filing 12 DEFICIENT: EXPARTE/CONSENT SECOND MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re 4 Habeas Corpus Response Order, 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) by Darryl Vannoy. Motion(s) referred to Janis van Meerveld. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 21-870)(Caplan, Matthew) Modified text on 6/22/2021 (mm).
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: The above matter is hereby consolidated with 2:21-cv-0898-SSV-JVM. Pursuant to the Court's directive, all pleadings hereafter filed in this consolidated proceeding shall bear the caption of the lead consolidated case together with the docket number of all cases within the consolidation to which the document applies or the notation "ALL CASES" if it applies to all cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 6/15/2021. (Ref: 21-870, 21-989) (ajn)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The Clerk of Court is ORDERED to reallot the above-captioned case to another section of court. Judge Greg Gerard Guidry recused. Case reassigned to Judge Sarah S. Vance. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 6/7/2021.(mm)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to Darryl Vannoy. Answer due 6/23/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 6/2/2021. (ajn)
June 1, 2021 Filing 8 EXPARTE/CONSENT First MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #4 Habeas Corpus Response Order, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) by Darryl Vannoy. Motion(s) referred to Janis van Meerveld. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Matthew Caplan added to party Darryl Vannoy(pty:dft).(Caplan, Matthew)
May 11, 2021 Filing 7 Return of Service of H/C Response Order served on Louisiana Department of Justice-Attorney General's Office on 5/5/2021(mm)
May 7, 2021 Filing 6 Return of Service of H/C Response Order served on St. Tammany Parish Clerk on 5/5/2021.(mm)
May 6, 2021 Filing 5 Return of Service of H/C Response Order served on St. Tammany Parish District Attorney's Office on 5/4/2021.(mm)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Habeas Corpus Response Order that Attorney General for the State of Louisiana and the District Attorney and Clerk of Court for St. Tammany Parish respond to the petition of Habeas Corpus within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 5/3/2021.(ajn) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/3/2021: #1 Certified Mail Receipts) (ajn).
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 5/3/2021. (ajn)
April 29, 2021 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Marlone R Brumfield. Motion(s) referred to Janis van Meerveld. (mm)
April 29, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) filed by Marlone R Brumfield. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(mm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brumfield v. Attorney General State of Louisiana et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlone R Brumfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darryl Vannoy
Represented By: Matthew Caplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General State of Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?