Williams v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Lavell Williams
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2021cv00895
Filed: May 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Donna Phillips Currault
Referring Judge: Ivan LR Lemelle
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address by Lavell Williams. (am)
May 7, 2021 Filing 6 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #3 NOTICE. **Document was filed in error, please disregard.** (am)
May 7, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration. (2 cc: Mailed to Plaintiff, with attachments) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(sa)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 5/6/2021. (2 cc: Summons, Complaints, Pauper Order, Pauper Letter sent to Plaintiff by US Mail) (sa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/7/2021: #1 Pauper Letter) (sa).
May 6, 2021 Filing 3 FILED IN ERROR: NOTICE Regarding Local Civil Rule 54.7. (am) Modified on 6/2/2021 (sa).
May 5, 2021 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lavell Williams. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. (am)
May 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration filed by Lavell Williams. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lavell Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?