Lewis et al v. United States et al
Plaintiff: G. Lewis-Louisiana, LLC and Garry L Lewis
Defendant: United States Army Corps of Engineers, United States, Stephen Murphy and Diana Holland
Case Number: 2:2021cv00937
Filed: May 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Mary Ann Vial Lemmon
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
2 Judge: Michael North
3 Judge: Sarah S Vance
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed; United States (through U.S. Attorney) served on 5/22/2021, answer due 7/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Certified Mail Receipt)(Lewis, Drake) Modified text, added answer deadline on 7/7/2021 (sbs).
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed; United States (through U.S. Attorney General) served on 5/25/2021, answer due 7/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Certified Mail Receipt)(Lewis, Drake) Modified text, added answer deadline on 7/7/2021 (sbs).
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Diana Holland served on 6/4/2021, answer due 8/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Certified Mail Receipt)(Lewis, Drake) Modified text, added answer deadline on 7/7/2021 (sbs).
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Stephen Murphy served on 5/21/2021, answer due 7/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Certified Mail Receipt)(Lewis, Drake) Modified text, added answer deadline on 7/7/2021 (sbs).
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed; United States Army Corps of Engineers served on 5/22/2021, answer due 7/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Certified Mail Receipt)(Lewis, Drake) Modified text, added answer deadline on 7/7/2021 (sbs).
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed; United States served on 5/25/2021, answer due 7/26/2021 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Certified Mail Receipt)(Lewis, Drake) Modified text, added answer deadline on 7/7/2021 (sbs).
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Izfar on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney Sarah Izfar added to party Diana Holland(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah Izfar added to party Stephen Murphy(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah Izfar added to party United States(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah Izfar added to party United States Army Corps of Engineers(pty:dft).(Izfar, Sarah)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Summons Issued as to United States, United States Army Corps of Engineers. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(sbs)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Request of Summons Issued as to United States filed by All Plaintiffs re #1 Complaint. (Lewis, Drake)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Request of Summons Issued as to United States filed by All Plaintiffs re #1 Complaint. (Lewis, Drake)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Request of Summons Issued as to United States Army Corps of Engineers filed by All Plaintiffs re #1 Complaint. (Lewis, Drake)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Request of Summons Issued as to United States filed by All Plaintiffs re #1 Complaint. (Lewis, Drake)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by G. Lewis-Louisiana, LLC (bm)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Diana Holland, Stephen Murphy, United States, United States Army Corps of Engineers. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(bm)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of Summons. The pdf should not have the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. (bm)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING DUE TO RELATED PROCEEDING. Case transferred to Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. Judge Sarah S. Vance, Magistrate Judge Michael North no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 5/13/2021.(mm) (NEF: DJ, MJ)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (go)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8856650) filed by Garry L Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 218-1838 Doc 66, #2 Exhibit 2 218-1838 Doc 80, #3 Exhibit 3 218-1838 Doc 85, #4 Exhibit 4 218-1838 Doc 99, #5 Exhibit 5 Guarisco Declaration etc, #6 Exhibit 6 Wheeler order 20cv03005-RS doc171, #7 Exhibit 7 Wheeler brief Doc215 1-10-21, #8 Exhibit 8 Dec 28 2020 AJD, #9 Exhibit 9 AJD request resubmittal, #10 Exhibit 10 2016 AJD, #11 Exhibit 11 maps of test plots 2016-17 AJD, #12 Exhibit 12 Admin Appeal Decision, #13 Exhibit 13 2017 AJD, #14 Exhibit 14 Flood housing permit request, #15 Exhibit 15 FEMA Draft study of subject property, #16 Exhibit 16 Admin Appeal request, #17 Exhibit 17 40 acre tolling agreement, #18 Exhibit 18 404 permit application, #19 Exhibit 19 roadside ditch photos, #20 Exhibit 20 19 acre Milton Lane AJD, #21 Exhibit 21 visual aid of Eastern tract, #22 Exhibit 22 Satsuma history, #23 Exhibit 23 Milton Lane efforts, #24 Affidavit verification, #25 Civil Cover Sheet, #26 Summons United States, #27 Summons United States Army Corps of Engineers, #28 Summons Col. Stephen Murphy New Orleans District Commander, #29 Summons Major Gen. Diana Holland MS Valley Div Commander, #30 Statement Local Rule 3.1 Certificate, #31 Statement Corporate Disclosure)Attorney Drake L. Lewis added to party Garry L Lewis(pty:pla).(Lewis, Drake) (Attachment 26 replaced on 5/13/2021) (bm). (Attachment 27 replaced on 5/13/2021) (bm). (Attachment 28 replaced on 5/13/2021) (bm). (Attachment 29 replaced on 5/13/2021) (bm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis et al v. United States et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Army Corps of Engineers
Represented By: Sarah Izfar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Represented By: Sarah Izfar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Murphy
Represented By: Sarah Izfar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diana Holland
Represented By: Sarah Izfar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G. Lewis-Louisiana, LLC
Represented By: Drake L. Lewis
Represented By: Antonio M. Clayton
Represented By: Joshua M. Lewis
Represented By: Michael Paul Fruge
Represented By: Stanley A. Millan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garry L Lewis
Represented By: Drake L. Lewis
Represented By: Antonio M. Clayton
Represented By: Joshua M. Lewis
Represented By: Michael Paul Fruge
Represented By: Stanley A. Millan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?