Triple S Marine, LLC v. Pontchartrain Partners, LLC
Plaintiff: Triple S Marine, LLC
Defendant: Pontchartrain Partners, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv00948
Filed: May 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Jay C Zainey
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE Scheduling Conference reset for 8/12/2021 9:00 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk.(jrc)
July 6, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 8/5/2021 10:30 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (jrc)
June 29, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM with Jury Demand against Triple S Marine, LLC by Pontchartrain Partners, LLC.(McDonald, Jeffrey) Modified text on 6/30/2021 to correct party name (ajn).
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting #11 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added Attorney's Brett M. Bollinger, Randell E. Treadaway, Jeffrey E. McDonald, Brad D. Ferrand, and Jeremy Hite Call for Pontchartrain Partners, LLC. Attorney Jason R. Anders terminated. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 6/23/2021. (ajn)
June 21, 2021 Filing 11 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Jeffrey E. McDonald to be substituted in place of Jason R. Anders by Pontchartrain Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Anders, Jason)
June 18, 2021 Filing 10 ***DEFICIENT*** ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Triple S Marine, LLC by Pontchartrain Partners, LLC.Attorney Jeffrey E. McDonald added to party Pontchartrain Partners, LLC(pty:dft).(McDonald, Jeffrey) Modified on 6/21/2021 (ajn).
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to Pontchartrain Partners, LLC. Answer due 6/28/2021. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 6/7/2021. (ajn)
June 4, 2021 Filing 8 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by Pontchartrain Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Jason R. Anders added to party Pontchartrain Partners, LLC(pty:dft).(Anders, Jason)
May 18, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Pontchartrain Partners, LLC served on 5/17/2021, answer due 6/7/2021. (Morse, Harry)
May 14, 2021 Filing 6 Civil Cover Sheet Submitted (Morse, Harry)
May 14, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Pontchartrain Partners, LLC. (lt)
May 14, 2021 Filing 4 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the Civil Cover Sheet. Civil cover sheet was left blank and not filled out properly. Filing attorney will need to resubmit a completed form. Also, Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the Civil Cover sheet. The pdf should have been flattened. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click PRINT to adobe pdf to flatten the document to pdf format. (lt)
May 14, 2021 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (go)
May 14, 2021 Filing 2 Request of Summons Issued as to Pontchartrain Partners, LLC filed by Triple S Marine, LLC re #1 Complaint,. (Morse, Harry)
May 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pontchartrain Partners, LLC (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8859623) filed by Triple S Marine, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)Attorney Harry E. Morse added to party Triple S Marine, LLC(pty:pla).(Morse, Harry) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/14/2021) (lt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Triple S Marine, LLC v. Pontchartrain Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pontchartrain Partners, LLC
Represented By: Brett M. Bollinger
Represented By: Brad D. Ferrand
Represented By: Jason R. Anders
Represented By: Jeffrey E. McDonald
Represented By: Jeremy Hite Call
Represented By: Randell E. Treadaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Triple S Marine, LLC
Represented By: Martin S. Bohman
Represented By: Harry E. Morse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?