Cambre et al v. Union Carbide Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Denise Marchese, Gia Lewis Grows, Rosalie Myers, Yvonne Wolfe, Quincee Berthelot, Terri Cambre and Pamela Meredith
Defendant: Donald Eastepp, Jorge Cerame, Brian Eiler, Michael Faulkner, Jackie Yaworski, Union Carbide Corporation and Dow Chemical Company
Case Number: 2:2021cv01067
Filed: June 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Referring Judge: Sarah S Vance
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER denying #36 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 7/29/2021. (mm)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by Dow Chemical Company, Union Carbide Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading, #2 Proposed Order)(Trapolin, Edward)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 REPLY MEMORANDUM in Support of re #21 MOTION to Remand filed by Quincee Berthelot, Terri Cambre, Gia Lewis Grows, Denise Marchese, Pamela Meredith, Rosalie Myers, Yvonne Wolfe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B, #2 Exhibit C-D, #3 Exhibit E-H)(pp)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING #33 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Support of the Motion to Remand is hereby filed in the record. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 7/28/2021. (pp)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand by Quincee Berthelot, Terri Cambre, Gia Lewis Grows, Denise Marchese, Pamela Meredith, Rosalie Myers, Yvonne Wolfe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading, #2 Exhibit A-B, #3 Exhibit C-D, #4 Exhibit E-H, #5 Proposed Order)(Thornton, Jennifer) Modified text/event on 7/28/2021 (bw).
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Dow Chemical Company, Union Carbide Corporation re #21 MOTION to Remand . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Trapolin, Edward)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Jackie Yaworski.(Trapolin, Edward)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Union Carbide Corporation.(Trapolin, Edward)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Michael Faulkner.(Trapolin, Edward)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Brian Eiler.(Trapolin, Edward)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Donald Eastepp.(Trapolin, Edward)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Jorge Cerame.(Trapolin, Edward)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Dow Chemical Company.(Trapolin, Edward)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 MOTION to Continue Submission Date of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand. IT IS ORDERED that the submission date for #21 Motion to Remand is hereby continued until July 28, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 6/30/2021.(mm)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Submission Date of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand re: rec. doc. 21 by Jorge Cerame, Dow Chemical Company, Donald Eastepp, Brian Eiler, Michael Faulkner, Union Carbide Corporation, Jackie Yaworski. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Trapolin, Edward)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #21 MOTION to Remand. **Filing attorney did not select Terri Cambre, Quincee Berthelot as a filer(s). Clerk added filer(s).** (mm)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION to Remand by Gia Lewis Grows, Denise Marchese, Pamela Meredith, Rosalie Myers, Yvonne Wolfe, Terri Cambre, Quincee Berthelot. Motion(s) will be submitted on 7/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Notice of Submission)(Thornton, Jennifer) Modified filers on 6/29/2021 (mm).
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Kristen Renee Fournier. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 6/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 PHV Notice) (mm)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Kristen Fournier (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8907892) by Jorge Cerame, Dow Chemical Company, Donald Eastepp, Brian Eiler, Michael Faulkner, Union Carbide Corporation, Jackie Yaworski. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit, #3 Certificate of Good Standing DC, #4 Certificate of Good Standing NY, #5 CMECF Form)(Trapolin, Edward) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/21/2021: #6 Certificate of Good Standing - Virginia) (mp).
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #16 Notice of Compliance. **Filing attorney should have linked filing to Document 1. Clerk properly linked document.** (mm)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Notice of Compliance with 28 U.S.C. 1447(b) by All Defendants re #1 Notice of Removal. (Trapolin, Edward) Modified linkage on 6/17/2021 (mm).
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to John Ewald. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 6/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 PHV Notice) (mm)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Alvin Lee. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 6/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 PHV Notice) (mm)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Union Carbide Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Dow Inc., Corporate Parent Dow Chemical Company for Union Carbide Corporation (Trapolin, Edward)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice John Ewald, #11 Statement of Corporate Disclosure, #9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Alvin Lee. **Document contains incorrect caption. All future pleadings should reflect the correct caption: Cambre et al v. Union Carbide Corporation et al.** (mm)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 DEFICIENT: Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Union Carbide Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Dow Inc., Corporate Parent Dow Chemical Company for Union Carbide Corporation (Trapolin, Edward) Modified text on 6/15/2021 (mm).
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Dow Chemical Company identifying Corporate Parent Dow Inc. for Dow Chemical Company (Trapolin, Edward)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice John Ewald (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8902791) by Jorge Cerame, Dow Chemical Company, Donald Eastepp, Brian Eiler, Michael Faulkner, Union Carbide Corporation, Jackie Yaworski. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit, #3 Certificate of Good Standing, #4 CMECF Form)(Trapolin, Edward)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Alvin Lee (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8902762) by Jorge Cerame, Dow Chemical Company, Donald Eastepp, Brian Eiler, Michael Faulkner, Union Carbide Corporation, Jackie Yaworski. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit, #3 Certificate of Good Standing, #4 CMECF Form)(Trapolin, Edward)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal as to Jorge Cerame answer due 6/30/2021; Dow Chemical Company answer due 6/30/2021; Donald Eastepp answer due 6/30/2021; Brian Eiler answer due 6/30/2021; Michael Faulkner answer due 6/30/2021; Union Carbide Corporation answer due 6/30/2021; Jackie Yaworski answer due 6/30/2021. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 6/7/2021. (mm)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal. **Filing attorney should have linked filing to Document 1. Clerk properly linked document.** (mm)
June 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal by Jorge Cerame, Dow Chemical Company, Donald Eastepp, Brian Eiler, Michael Faulkner, Union Carbide Corporation, Jackie Yaworski. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Attorney Edward Winter Trapolin added to party Jorge Cerame(pty:dft), Attorney Edward Winter Trapolin added to party Donald Eastepp(pty:dft), Attorney Edward Winter Trapolin added to party Brian Eiler(pty:dft), Attorney Edward Winter Trapolin added to party Michael Faulkner(pty:dft), Attorney Edward Winter Trapolin added to party Jackie Yaworski(pty:dft).(Trapolin, Edward) Modified text/added linkage on 6/7/2021 (mm).
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal. The case caption of all future filings should remain as pleadings were captioned in state court, and all parties should be listed instead of using 'et al'. (bm)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Union Carbide Corporation, Dow Chemical Company. (bm)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal. **Clerk requested a corrected copy of the Notice of Removal to reflect the correct caption. Attorney subsequently provided a corrected copy and clerk has taken corrective action. No further action is required.** (mm)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (go)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 29th JDC for the Parish of St. Charles, case number 89168 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8885117) filed by Union Carbide Corporation, Dow Chemical Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Petition, #2 State Court Pleadings, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Edward Winter Trapolin added to party Dow Chemical Company(pty:dft), Attorney Edward Winter Trapolin added to party Union Carbide Corporation(pty:dft).(Trapolin, Edward) (Main Document 1 replaced on 6/3/2021) (mm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cambre et al v. Union Carbide Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Marchese
Represented By: Richard P Voorhies, III
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thornton
Represented By: William Barousse
Represented By: William M. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gia Lewis Grows
Represented By: Richard P Voorhies, III
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thornton
Represented By: William Barousse
Represented By: William M. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalie Myers
Represented By: Richard P Voorhies, III
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thornton
Represented By: William Barousse
Represented By: William M. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvonne Wolfe
Represented By: Richard P Voorhies, III
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thornton
Represented By: William Barousse
Represented By: William M. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quincee Berthelot
Represented By: Richard P Voorhies, III
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thornton
Represented By: William Barousse
Represented By: William M. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terri Cambre
Represented By: Richard P Voorhies, III
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thornton
Represented By: William Barousse
Represented By: William M. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Meredith
Represented By: Richard P Voorhies, III
Represented By: Jennifer L. Thornton
Represented By: William Barousse
Represented By: William M. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Eastepp
Represented By: Timothy Farrow Daniels
Represented By: Alvin Lee
Represented By: Edward Winter Trapolin
Represented By: John Ewald
Represented By: Kristen Renee Fournier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorge Cerame
Represented By: Timothy Farrow Daniels
Represented By: Alvin Lee
Represented By: Edward Winter Trapolin
Represented By: John Ewald
Represented By: Kristen Renee Fournier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Eiler
Represented By: Timothy Farrow Daniels
Represented By: Alvin Lee
Represented By: Edward Winter Trapolin
Represented By: John Ewald
Represented By: Kristen Renee Fournier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Faulkner
Represented By: Timothy Farrow Daniels
Represented By: Alvin Lee
Represented By: Edward Winter Trapolin
Represented By: John Ewald
Represented By: Kristen Renee Fournier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackie Yaworski
Represented By: Timothy Farrow Daniels
Represented By: Alvin Lee
Represented By: Edward Winter Trapolin
Represented By: John Ewald
Represented By: Kristen Renee Fournier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Edward Winter Trapolin
Represented By: Timothy Farrow Daniels
Represented By: Alvin Lee
Represented By: John Ewald
Represented By: Kristen Renee Fournier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dow Chemical Company
Represented By: Edward Winter Trapolin
Represented By: Timothy Farrow Daniels
Represented By: Alvin Lee
Represented By: John Ewald
Represented By: Kristen Renee Fournier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?