Bowman et al v. R. L. Young, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: A & H Solutions, Inc. and Luke Bowman
Defendant: Young & Associates, R. L. Young, Inc. and R. L. Young, Inc. doing business as Young and Associates
Case Number: 2:2021cv01071
Filed: June 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Michael North
Referring Judge: Wendy B Vitter
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by R. L. Young, Inc. re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Transfer Case . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C)(jeg)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the #19 Motion is GRANTED. The Clerk's Office is directed to file the Reply (R. Doc. 19-1), with its attachment (R. Doc. 19-2), into the record. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 7/28/2021. (jeg)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum to Plaintiffs Response in Opposition (R. Doc. 17) by R. L. Young, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Proposed Order)(Spell, Mary)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE regarding Oral Argument re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Transfer Case filed by R. L. Young, Inc. By Clerk.(mmv)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Transfer Case . (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Luke Bowman, #2 Declaration Exhibit 1, #3 Declaration Exhibit 2, #4 Declaration Exhibit 3)(Sensenbrenner, Erica)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/17/2022 10:00 AM before Judge Wendy B Vitter. Status Conference set for 9/28/2021 02:00 PM before Judge Wendy B Vitter. Jury Trial set for 3/7/2022 09:00 AM before Judge Wendy B Vitter. All discovery must be completed by 12/20/2021. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 7/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form)(jeg) Modified text to reflect correct Jury Trial date on 7/12/2021 (jeg).
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the #13 #14 Motions are GRANTED. Katherine McLaughlin and Michael Stephens are permitted to appear as visiting attorneys on behalf of Defendant R.L. Young, Inc. d/b/a Young & Associates. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 7/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 PHV Notice) (jeg)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Michael P. Stephens (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8938290) by R. L. Young, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order)(Spell, Mary)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number CLAEDC-8938059) by R. L. Young, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order)(Spell, Mary)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk: Please note that all future pleadings must contain Section and Magistrate Judge information. All future pleadings must reflect Section D Judge Wendy B. Vitter and Magistrate 5, Magistrate Judge Michael B. North. (jeg)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by R. L. Young, Inc. regarding #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Transfer Case (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Spell, Mary)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Transfer Case by R. L. Young, Inc.. Motion(s) will be submitted on 7/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Submission, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Spell, Mary)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #8 Response/Reply. **Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is NOTICE of Compliance. Clerk took corrective action by changing the event. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Compliance Pursuant to 28:1447(b) by All Defendants re #5 Directive (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B)(Spell, Mary) Modified text/event on 6/21/2021 (jeg).
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing. A call-in scheduling conference is set for 7/9/2021 10:30 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. Please follow the instructions provided in the notice. (mmv)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the #2 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant, R.L. Young, Inc., is granted an extension of time up to and including July 1, 2021, in which to file its pleadings in response to Plaintiff's Petition. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 6/4/2021. (jeg)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DIRECTIVE of the Court pursuant to 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by R. L. Young, Inc. By the Clerk.(jeg)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer. **Documents lists counsel Michael P. Stephens and Katherine I. McLaughlin, for a party in this action who have not been admitted to practice in this court. Any party not appearing in proper person must be represented by a member of the bar of this court (L.R. 83.2.4). Please see Local Rule 83.2.2 for this court's Procedures for Admission and Local Rule 83.2.5 for Visiting Attorneys to appear and participate Pro Hac Vice. Any future filings which list attorneys not admitted pursuant to LR 83.2.2 or 83.2.5 will not be accepted and will be deemed deficient.** (jeg)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Wendy B Vitter and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (go)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal- Petition for Damages by R. L. Young, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Spell, Mary) Modified text on 6/4/2021 (jeg).
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court - Orleans Parish, 21-03724 Div F 14 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BLAEDC-8886082) filed by Young & Associates, R. L. Young, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)Attorney Mary Margaret Spell added to party R. L. Young, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Mary Margaret Spell added to party Young & Associates(pty:dft).(Spell, Mary) Modified text on 6/4/2021 (jeg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowman et al v. R. L. Young, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Young & Associates
Represented By: Mary Margaret Spell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. L. Young, Inc.
Represented By: Mary Margaret Spell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. L. Young, Inc. doing business as Young and Associates
Represented By: Mary Margaret Spell
Represented By: Jason A. Culotta
Represented By: Katherine I. McLaughlin
Represented By: Michael P. Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A & H Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Charles A. Cerise, Jr.
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Roussel
Represented By: Erica Sensenbrenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luke Bowman
Represented By: Charles A. Cerise, Jr.
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Roussel
Represented By: Erica Sensenbrenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?