Integrity Bulk APS v. CS Satira M/V et al
Plaintiff: Integrity Bulk APS
Defendant: CS Satira M/V and Satira Shipping Company, Ltd.
Case Number: 2:2021cv01114
Filed: June 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2021 Filing 26 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Integrity Bulk APS re #22 MOTION to Vacate #10 Order on Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem, #12 Order on Motion for Writ of Attachment . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Christopher Wood)(LaVie, Kevin)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the oral argument on Defendant's Motion to Vacate (R. Doc. #22 ), currently set for August 12, 2021, is hereby RESET for August 13, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom C224. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 07/19/2021.(am)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached). IT IS ORDERED that the Request for Oral Argument (R. Doc. 20) is GRANTED. Oral argument on Defendant's Motion to Vacate (R. Doc. 22) is hereby SET for August 12, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom C224. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo.(Bergeron, Monica)
July 15, 2021 Filing 23 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #22 MOTION to Vacate #10 Order on Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem, #12 Order on Motion for Writ of Attachment. **Filing attorney selected incorrect submission/hearing date. Correct date is 8/11/21. Clerk took corrective action. No further action necessary.** (am)
July 15, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION to Vacate #10 Order on Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem, #12 Order on Motion for Writ of Attachment by CS Satira M/V, Satira Shipping Company, Ltd.. Motion(s) will be submitted on 8/11/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Vacate, #2 Appendix Exhibit 1 to Memo in Support - Cawley Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1 to Cawley Declaration, #4 Exhibit 2 to Cawley Declaration, #5 Exhibit 2 to Memo in Support, #6 Notice of Submission)Attorney Jonathan Joseph Segarra added to party CS Satira M/V(pty:dft).(Segarra, Jonathan) Modified text/submission date on 7/15/2021 (am).
July 15, 2021 Filing 21 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #19 MOTION to Vacate #18 MOTION to Vacate Arrest/Attachment of the CS SATIRA. **Document marked filed in error. The document should have been attached to rec. doc. 18.** (am)
July 14, 2021 Filing 20 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by CS Satira M/V, Satira Shipping Company, Ltd. regarding #22 MOTION to Vacate Arrest/Attachment of the CS SATIRA , (Segarra, Jonathan) Modified text/linkage on 7/15/2021 (am).
July 14, 2021 Filing 19 **FILED IN ERROR - SHOULD HAVE BEEN ATTACHED TO REC. DOC. 18** MOTION to Vacate #18 MOTION to Vacate Arrest/Attachment of the CS SATIRA by CS Satira M/V, Satira Shipping Company, Ltd.. Motion(s) will be submitted on 7/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William Cawley, #2 Head Charterparty)Attorney Jonathan Joseph Segarra added to party Satira Shipping Company, Ltd.(pty:dft).(Segarra, Jonathan) Modified text on 7/15/2021 (am).
July 14, 2021 Filing 18 **DEFICIENT** MOTION to Vacate Arrest/Attachment of the CS SATIRA by CS Satira M/V. Motion(s) will be submitted on 7/28/2021. Attorney Jonathan Joseph Segarra added to party CS Satira M/V(pty:dft).(Segarra, Jonathan) Modified text on 7/15/2021 (am).
July 14, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE by All Defendants Verified Statement of Interest. (Segarra, Jonathan)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #6 Motion Appoint Private Process Server. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 06/09/2021. (3cc: USM) (am)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appoint/Substitute Custodian. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 06/09/2021. (3cc: USM) (am)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #4 Motion Permit Repairs, Cargo Operations and Vessel Movement. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 06/09/2021. (3cc: USM) (am)
June 9, 2021 Filing 13 WRIT of Attachment & Garnishment issued. (3cc: USM) (am)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Writ of Attachment & Garnishment. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 06/09/2021. (3cc: USM)(am)
June 9, 2021 Filing 11 WARRANT of of Vessel in rem issued. (3cc: USM) (am)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 06/09/2021.(3cc: USM) (am)
June 9, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Satira Shipping Company, Ltd. (am)
June 9, 2021 Filing 8 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. **Exhibits on incorrect sized paper. Local Rule 10.1E states 'All papers drafted for filing in this court shall be on 8-1/2 by 11 inch paper. Clerk has reduced images. No further action needed.** (am)
June 9, 2021 Filing 7 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (ess)
June 9, 2021 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appoint Private Process Server by Integrity Bulk APS. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading)(LaVie, Kevin)
June 9, 2021 Filing 5 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appoint/Substitute Custodian by Integrity Bulk APS. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration, #3 Certificate of Insurance)(LaVie, Kevin)
June 9, 2021 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Permit Repairs, Cargo Operations and Vessel Movement by Integrity Bulk APS. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(LaVie, Kevin)
June 9, 2021 Filing 3 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Writ of of Foreign Attachment by Integrity Bulk APS. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Writ of Foreign Attachment)(LaVie, Kevin)
June 9, 2021 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Issuance of Warrant of Arrest in rem by Integrity Bulk APS. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Warrant of Arrest)(LaVie, Kevin)
June 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Integrity Bulk APS (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8894445) filed by M/V CS SATIRA, Satira Shipping Company, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Charter Party, #2 Exhibit 2 - hire statement, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Affidavit Rule B)Attorney Kevin J. LaVie added to party M/V CS SATIRA(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin J. LaVie added to party Satira Shipping Company, Ltd.(pty:dft).(LaVie, Kevin) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/9/2021) (am). (Attachment 2 replaced on 6/9/2021) (am). Modified on 6/9/2021 (am).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Integrity Bulk APS v. CS Satira M/V et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CS Satira M/V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Satira Shipping Company, Ltd.
Represented By: Antonio J. Rodriguez
Represented By: Henry J. Rodriguez
Represented By: Jonathan Joseph Segarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Integrity Bulk APS
Represented By: Kevin J. LaVie
Represented By: Magdalini Galitou
Represented By: Adam N. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?