Miller v. Jayco, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Amy Claire Miller
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association, Dixie Motors, LLC, Jayco, Inc. and Dixie Motors, L.L.C.
Case Number: 2:2021cv01218
Filed: June 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Carl Barbier
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2301
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2021 Filing 16 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Amend/Correct #11 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States Federal Court for the Northern District of Indiana, South Bend, #1 Complaint, by Amy Claire Miller. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Pleading Amended Complaint, #4 Proposed Pleading Amended Civil Cover Sheet)(Dalton, Richard)
August 20, 2021 Filing 15 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States Federal Court for the Northern District of Indiana, South Bend by Amy Claire Miller. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support)(Dalton, Richard)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Marc Cabrera. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 08/03/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (ko)
August 2, 2021 Filing 13 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Marc D. Cabrera - Corrective Document (Fee previously paid) by U.S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit Exhibit B - Statement of No Disciplinary Proceedings, #3 Exhibit C - Consent to Electronic Filing, #4 Proposed Order)(Domingue, Lamont)
July 29, 2021 Filing 12 DEFICIENT: EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Marc D. Cabrera (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8972627) by U.S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit Exhibit B - Statement of No Disciplinary Proceedings, #3 Exhibit C - Consent to Electronic Filing, #4 Proposed Order)(Domingue, Lamont) Modified on 7/29/2021 (cg).
July 29, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States Federal Court for the Northern District of Indiana, South Bend by Dixie Motors, L.L.C., Jayco, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association. Motion(s) will be submitted on 10/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Stephen L. Guidry, Jr., #3 Exhibit B - Declaration of Phil Houser, #4 Notice of Submission)(Domingue, Lamont)
July 29, 2021 Filing 10 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Dixie Motors, L.L.C., Jayco, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association identifying Corporate Parent Thor Industries, Inc. for Jayco, Inc.; Corporate Parent U S Bancorp for U.S. Bank National Association (Domingue, Lamont)
July 29, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by U.S. Bank National Association.Attorney Lamont P. Domingue added to party U.S. Bank National Association(pty:dft).(Domingue, Lamont)
July 29, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Dixie Motors, L.L.C..Attorney Lamont P. Domingue added to party Dixie Motors, L.L.C.(pty:dft).(Domingue, Lamont)
July 29, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Jayco, Inc..Attorney Lamont P. Domingue added to party Jayco, Inc.(pty:dft).(Domingue, Lamont)
July 22, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to U.S. Bank National Association on 6/29/2021, answer due 8/30/2021. (Dalton, Richard)
July 8, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Jayco, Inc. on 6/29/2021, answer due 8/30/2021. (Dalton, Richard)
July 8, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Dixie Motors, LLC on 6/29/2021, answer due 8/30/2021. (Dalton, Richard)
June 23, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Dixie Motors, LLC, Jayco, Inc., U.S. Bank, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(cg)
June 23, 2021 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (cc)
June 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8914435) filed by Amy Claire Miller. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)Attorney Richard Collins Dalton added to party Amy Claire Miller(pty:pla).(Dalton, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Jayco, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Lamont P. Domingue
Represented By: Marc Cabrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dixie Motors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jayco, Inc.
Represented By: Lamont P. Domingue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dixie Motors, L.L.C.
Represented By: Lamont P. Domingue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Claire Miller
Represented By: Richard Collins Dalton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?