Adams v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: MITCHELL JOSEPH ADAMS, JR. and Mitchell Joseph Adams, Jr
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY and Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2021cv01246
Filed: June 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Social Security Administration served on 8/9/2021, answer due 10/8/2021. (Wicklund, Edward)
July 1, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Summons AUSA EDLA, #2 Summons Attorney General)(jeg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/6/2021: #3 Pauper Letter) (jeg).
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 6/30/2021. (jeg)
June 30, 2021 Filing 7 Social Security Response Order: The Plaintiff's BRIEF is due within 40 days after the defendant has filed its answer, and Defendant's REPLY BRIEF is due within 45 days after the plaintiffs brief is filed. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 6/30/2021.(jeg)(CC: AUSA)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Edward A Wicklund.. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 6/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 PHV Notice) (jeg)
June 28, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE Regarding Local CivilRule 54.7.(bw)
June 25, 2021 Filing 4 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cc)
June 25, 2021 Filing 3 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Edward Allen Wicklund (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8920834) by Mitchell Joseph Adams , Jr. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Misko, Benjamin) . Modified text on 6/28/2021 (bw).
June 25, 2021 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mitchell Joseph Adams , Jr. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (Attachments: #1 In Forma Pauperis, #2 Proposed Order)(Misko, Benjamin) . Modified text on 6/28/2021 (bw).
June 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration (In Forma Pauperis status requested) filed by Mitchell Joseph Adams , Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Notice of Appeals Council Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Proposed Summons)Attorney Benjamin M. Misko added to party Mitchell Joseph Adams , Jr.(pty:pla).(Misko, Benjamin) Modified text on 6/28/2021 (bw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MITCHELL JOSEPH ADAMS, JR.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Misko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitchell Joseph Adams, Jr
Represented By: Benjamin M. Misko
Represented By: Edward A Wicklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?