Walker v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Mr. Charles C Walker and Charles C. Walker
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Not Classified By Court: Comm. of SSA Andrew Saul
Case Number: 2:2021cv01253
Filed: June 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2021 Filing 8 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #7 Summons Returned Executed as to USA or Agency of USA. Attachments have duplicate descriptions. For attachments, select either a category OR enter a description, selecting both will result in duplicate docket text. Clerk took corrective action. (cwa)
August 25, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Social Security Administration served on 7/26/2021, answer due 9/24/2021. (Attachments: #1 Executed Summons - Merrick Garland, #2 Executed Summons - Duane Evans)(Breuer, Wiebke) Modified text on 8/25/2021 (cwa).
July 12, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(jeg)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 7/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 IFP Letter) (jeg)
July 1, 2021 Filing 4 Social Security Response Order: The Plaintiff's BRIEF is due within 40 days after the defendant has filed his answer, and Defendant's REPLY BRIEF is due within 45 days after the plaintiffs brief is filed, as set forth herein. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 7/1/2021.(jeg) (CC: AUSA)
June 29, 2021 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cc)
June 28, 2021 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Charles C Walker. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to proceed IFP)(Breuer, Wiebke) Modified text/exparte on 6/29/2021 (jeg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/29/2021: #2 IFP Application) (cwa).
June 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul (In Forma Pauperis status requested) filed by Charles C Walker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix In Forma Pauperis, #3 Summons US Attorney, #4 Summons Attorney General, #5 Summons Commissioner of SSA)Attorney Wiebke Breuer added to party Charles C Walker(pty:pla).(Breuer, Wiebke) (Attachment 2 replaced on 6/29/2021) (cwa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Comm. of SSA Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Charles C Walker
Represented By: Wiebke Breuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles C. Walker
Represented By: Wiebke Breuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?