In the Matter of Ocean Princess International, Inc. et al
Petitioner: Ocean Line Holdings Limited, Hong Kong, Ocean Longevity Shipping and Management Co., Ltd., Ocean Princess International, Inc. and Ocean Longevity Shipping and Management Company, Ltd.
Claimant: Arena Energy LLC and Arena Offshore L.P.
Case Number: 2:2021cv01294
Filed: July 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Ivan LR Lemelle
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 30504
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #14 Motion for Entry of Default. IT IS ORDERED that the default of all persons or entities claiming damages against Ocean Princess International Inc., Ocean Line Holdings Limited, Hong Kong, and Ocean Longevity Shipping and Management Co., Ltd. for any loss, damage or injury arising out of the voyage during which the M/V OCEAN PRINCESS was in collision, as stated herein. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 8/24/2021. (pp)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/30/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle. Bench Trial set for 7/11/2022 at 9:00 AM before Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle. All discovery must be completed by 5/31/2022. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 8/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form)(dw) (NEF: Magistrate Judge)
August 19, 2021 Filing 14 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Entry of Default by Ocean Line Holdings Limited, Hong Kong, Ocean Longevity Shipping and Management Company, Ltd., Ocean Princess International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Riviere, William)
August 17, 2021 Filing 13 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Ocean Longevity Shipping and Management Company, Ltd. (Riviere, William)
August 17, 2021 Filing 12 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Ocean Line Holdings Limited, Hong Kong (Riviere, William)
August 17, 2021 Filing 11 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Ocean Princess International, Inc. (Riviere, William)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Kenneth W. Bullock, II. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 8/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 PHV Notice) (cwa)
August 9, 2021 Filing 8 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Arena Energy, LLC, Arena Offshore, LP (McGlone, Michael)
August 9, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 8/19/2021 at 11:30 AM before case manager by telephone. Issued by Clerk. (dw)
August 6, 2021 Filing 6 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Kenneth W. Bullock II (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8982724.**1.Filing attorney incorrectly changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the District Judge. Clerk took corrective action. 2. Filing attorney should have selected 'Yes' at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?'. Exparte/Consent Motions are not set for submission. Clerk modified docket text to reflect 'Exparte' and removed submission date. No further action necessary.** (pp)
August 5, 2021 Filing 5 EXPARTE MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Kenneth W. Bullock II (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8982724) by Arena Energy, LLC, Arena Offshore, LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Notice of Submission)(McGlone, Michael) Modified text on 8/6/2021 (pp). Modified text on 8/6/2021 (pp).
August 5, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER and CLAIM to #1 Complaint,,,, by Arena Energy, LLC, Arena Offshore, LP.Attorney Michael A. McGlone added to party Arena Energy, LLC(pty:res), Attorney Michael A. McGlone added to party Arena Offshore, LP(pty:res).(McGlone, Michael)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER APPROVING AFFIDAVIT OF VALUE, DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF NOTICE AND RESTRAINING PROSECUTION OF CLAIMS. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 7/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(pp)
July 2, 2021 Filing 10 Letter of Undertaking dated 7/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter) (dw)
July 2, 2021 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (cc)
July 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR EXONERATION FROM AND/OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY against Ocean Princess International, Inc., Ocean Longevity Shipping and Management Co., Ltd., Ocean Line Holdings Limited, Hong Kong (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8932457) filed by Ocean Princess International, Inc., Ocean Longevity Shipping and Management Co., Ltd., Ocean Line Holdings Limited, Hong Kong. (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration, #3 Exhibit B - Ship Valuation, #4 Exhibit C - Letter of Undertaking, #5 Local Rule 3.1 Notice, #6 Proposed Order Approving Letter of Undertaking, #7 Notice to Claimants, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney William Joseph Riviere added to party Ocean Line Holdings Limited, Hong Kong(pty:pet), Attorney William Joseph Riviere added to party Ocean Longevity Shipping and Management Co., Ltd.(pty:pet), Attorney William Joseph Riviere added to party Ocean Princess International, Inc.(pty:pet).(Riviere, William) Modified TEXT on 7/2/2021 (lw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In the Matter of Ocean Princess International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ocean Line Holdings Limited, Hong Kong
Represented By: William Joseph Riviere
Represented By: Adam N. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ocean Longevity Shipping and Management Co., Ltd.
Represented By: William Joseph Riviere
Represented By: Adam N. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ocean Princess International, Inc.
Represented By: William Joseph Riviere
Represented By: Adam N. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ocean Longevity Shipping and Management Company, Ltd.
Represented By: William Joseph Riviere
Represented By: Adam N. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Arena Energy LLC
Represented By: Michael A. McGlone
Represented By: Kenneth W. Bullock, II
Represented By: Richard C. Kean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Arena Offshore L.P.
Represented By: Michael A. McGlone
Represented By: Kenneth W. Bullock, II
Represented By: Richard C. Kean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?