In re: In the Matter of Cenac Towing Co., LLC
Petitioner: Cenac Towing Co., LLC
Claimant: Florida Marine Transporters, LLC, Jacqueline Berard, Shell Chemical LP, Shell Oil Company, Florida Marine Transporters, Inc., Murphy Oil USA Inc and Murphy Oil USA, Inc.
Consolidated Petitioner: Kirby Inland Marine, LP, Florida Marine, LLC and PBC Management, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv01349
Filed: July 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Donna Phillips Currault
Referring Judge: Martin LC Feldman
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 30504
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #25 MOTION for Extension. IT IS ORDERED that the submission date on all three Motions to Lift Stay (Rec. Docs. #5 , #11 , and #12 ) is continued to October 13, 2021. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 9/9/2021. (Reference: All Cases)(cbs)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #15 Answer to Complaint, #16 Answer to Complaint. 1. Caption is formatted incorrectly and must be corrected prior to any additional filings. Pursuant to the consolidation of cases, all pleadings hereafter filed in this consolidated proceeding shall bear the caption of the lead consolidated case, ie, 21-1349, together with the docket numbers of all cases within the consolidation. Furthermore, the caption must indicate which case the document applies, or the notation "ALL CASES" if it applies to all cases. (Reference: 21-1372, 21-1349)(bw)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION to Lift Stay by Florida Marine Transporters, LLC, Florida Marine, LLC, PBC Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 21-1349, 21-1372, 21-1406)(Finley, Jessica) Modified text on 9/9/2021 (bw).
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ANSWER to Complaint (Ct. R. Doc. 7) of Shell Oil Company and Shell Chemical LP in Cenac's Limitation Proceeding by Cenac Towing Co., LLC.(Reference: 2:21-cv-1349)(Hill, Mark)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint (Ct. R. Doc.13) of Kirby Inland Marine, LP in Cenac's Limitation Proceeding by Cenac Towing Co., LLC.(Reference: 2:21-cv-1349)(Hill, Mark)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint (Ct. R. Doc. 9) of Florida Marine, LLC, Florida Marine Transporters, LLC, and PBC Management, LLC in Cenac's Limitation Proceeding by Cenac Towing Co., LLC.(Reference: 2:21-cv-1349)(Hill, Mark)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint (Ct. R. Doc.4) of William and Jacqueline Berard in Cenac's Limitation Proceeding by Cenac Towing Co., LLC.(Reference: 2:21-cv-1349)(Hill, Mark)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ANSWER and CLAIM to #1 Complaint,, of Florida Marine, LLC and PBC Management, LLC for Exoneration From or Limitation of Liability by Cenac Towing Co., LLC.(Reference: 2:21-cv-1406)(Hill, Mark)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ANSWER and CLAIM to #1 Complaint,, of Kirby Inland Marine, LP for Exoneration From or Limitation of Liability by Cenac Towing Co., LLC.(Reference: 2:21-cv-1372)(Hill, Mark)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Cenac Towing Co., LLC re #5 Ex Parte MOTION Lift Stay . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Reference: 2:21-cv-1349)(Hill, Mark)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ANSWER and CLAIM to #1 Complaint,, by Murphy Oil USA, Inc..(Reference: 21-1406)(Garner, James)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ANSWER and CLAIM to #1 Complaint,, by Murphy Oil USA, Inc..(Reference: 21-01349)(Garner, James)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ANSWER and CLAIM to #1 Complaint,, by Murphy Oil USA, Inc..(Reference: 21-01372)Attorney James M. Garner added to party Murphy Oil USA, Inc.(pty:selreq).(Garner, James)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ANSWER and CLAIM to Complaint of Florida Marine by Kirby Inland Marine, LP.(Reference: 21-1372)(Ray, Robert)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ANSWER and CLAIM to #1 Complaint,, by Kirby Inland Marine, LP.(Reference: 21-1349)Attorney Robert Patrick Ray added to party Kirby Inland Marine, LP(pty:selreq).(Ray, Robert)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Lift Stay by Jacqueline Berard. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Submission, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Stipulations, #4 Proposed Order)(Originally filed on 8/19/2021 at Doc. 11 in 21-1406)(sa)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Lift Stay by Jacqueline Berard. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Submission, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Stipulations, #4 Proposed Order)(Originally filed on 8/19/2021 at Doc. 10 in 21-1372)(sa)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES - IT IS ORDERED that civil actions 21-1349, 21-1372, and 21-1406 are hereby CONSOLIDATED. Unless otherwise ordered, all future filings relating to such cases shall be made in the master case: 21-1349. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 8/25/2021. (Ref: 21-1349, 21-1372, 21-1406) (sa)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ANSWER and CLAIM to #1 Complaint,, by Florida Marine, LLC, PBC Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1)Attorney Anthony John Staines added to party Florida Marine, LLC(pty:selreq), Attorney Anthony John Staines added to party PBC Management, LLC(pty:selreq).(Staines, Anthony)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Shell Chemical LP, Shell Oil Company identifying Corporate Parent SCOGI GP, Corporate Parent Shell Oil Company, Corporate Parent Royal Dutch Shell plc for Shell Chemical LP; Corporate Parent SCOGI GP, Corporate Parent Royal Dutch Shell plc for Shell Oil Company (Best, Mark)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ANSWER and CLAIM to #1 Complaint,, by Shell Chemical LP, Shell Oil Company.Attorney Mark Edward Best added to party Shell Chemical LP(pty:clm), Attorney Mark Edward Best added to party Shell Oil Company(pty:clm).(Best, Mark)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #5 Ex Parte MOTION to Lift Stay. Filing attorney should have selected No at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?'. Clerk took corrective action to set motion for submission on 9/15/2021 before Judge Martin L.C. Feldman. No further action is necessary. (sa)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Lift Stay by Jacqueline Berard. Motion set for submission on 9/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Submission, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Stipulations, #4 Proposed Order)(Finckbeiner, John) Modified text/submission on 8/20/2021 (sa).
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ANSWER and CLAIM to #1 Complaint,, by Jacqueline Berard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letters of Testamentary) Attorney John Joseph Finckbeiner, Jr added to party Jacqueline Berard. (pty:clm).(Finckbeiner, John) Modified text/filers on 8/13/2021 (sa).
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER APPROVING AD INTERIM STIPULATION, DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF NOTICE, AND RESTRAINING PROSECUTION OF CLAIMS. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 07/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(ko)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Martin L.C. Feldman and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (aj)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR EXONERATION FROM AND/OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8952543) filed by Cenac Towing Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, Declaration of Value, #3 Exhibit 3, Verification, #4 Proposed Pleading Ad Interim Stipulation, #5 Exhibit Letter of Undertaking, #6 Statement Stipulation for Costs, #7 Proposed Order Notice to Claimants, #8 Proposed Order Order Approving Ad Interim Stipulation, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Mark Andrew Hill added to party Cenac Towing Co., LLC(pty:pet).(Hill, Mark) Modified text on 7/16/2021 (lw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: In the Matter of Cenac Towing Co., LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Cenac Towing Co., LLC
Represented By: Mark Andrew Hill
Represented By: Randolph J. Waits
Represented By: Matthew F Popp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Florida Marine Transporters, LLC
Represented By: Anthony John Staines
Represented By: Corey Patrick Parenton
Represented By: James A. Crouch, Jr
Represented By: Jason R. Kenney
Represented By: Jessica Bankston Finley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Jacqueline Berard
Represented By: L. Eric Williams, Jr.
Represented By: John Joseph Finckbeiner, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Shell Chemical LP
Represented By: Monique M. Weiner
Represented By: Mark Edward Best
Represented By: Perrey S. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Shell Oil Company
Represented By: Monique M. Weiner
Represented By: Mark Edward Best
Represented By: Perrey S. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Florida Marine Transporters, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony John Staines
Represented By: Corey Patrick Parenton
Represented By: James A. Crouch, Jr
Represented By: Jason R. Kenney
Represented By: Jessica Bankston Finley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Murphy Oil USA Inc
Represented By: James M. Garner
Represented By: Brandon William Keay
Represented By: Christopher Chocheles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Murphy Oil USA, Inc.
Represented By: James M. Garner
Represented By: Brandon William Keay
Represented By: Christopher Chocheles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated petitioner: Kirby Inland Marine, LP
Represented By: J. Dwight LeBlanc, III
Represented By: Robert Patrick Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated petitioner: Florida Marine, LLC
Represented By: Anthony John Staines
Represented By: Corey Patrick Parenton
Represented By: James A. Crouch, Jr
Represented By: Jason R. Kenney
Represented By: Jessica Bankston Finley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated petitioner: PBC Management, LLC
Represented By: Anthony John Staines
Represented By: Corey Patrick Parenton
Represented By: Jessica Bankston Finley
Represented By: James A. Crouch, Jr
Represented By: Jason R. Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?