In Re: In the Matter of the Complaint of Kirby Inland Marine, LP
Not Classified By Court: Kirby Inland Marine, LP
Claimant: Florida Marine Transporters, LLC, Jacqueline Berard, Shell Chemical LP, Shell Oil Company, Florida Marine, LLC, PBC Management, LLC, Florida Marine Transporters, Inc., Murphy Oil USA Inc and Cenac Towing Co., LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv01372
Filed: July 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Donna Phillips Currault
Referring Judge: Martin LC Feldman
2 Judge: Michael North
3 Judge: Jay C Zainey
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 30504
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES - IT IS ORDERED that civil actions 21-1349, 21-1372, and 21-1406 are hereby CONSOLIDATED. Unless otherwise ordered, all future filings relating to such cases shall be made in the master case: 21-1349. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 8/25/2021. (Ref: 21-1349, 21-1372, 21-1406)(sa)
August 25, 2021 Filing 16 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #14 Answer to Complaint. Filing attorney advised that Doc. #14 was filed in error, and has been properly re-filed at Doc. #15 . No further action necessary. (sa)
August 25, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER and CLAIM to #1 Complaint, by Florida Marine, LLC, PBC Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Staines, Anthony)
August 24, 2021 Filing 14 **FILED IN ERROR, See Doc. 15** ANSWER and CLAIM to #1 Complaint, by Florida Marine, LLC, PBC Management, LLC.Attorney Anthony John Staines added to party Florida Marine, LLC(pty:selreq), Attorney Anthony John Staines added to party PBC Management, LLC(pty:selreq).(Staines, Anthony) Modified on 8/25/2021 (sa).
August 24, 2021 Filing 13 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Shell Chemical LP, Shell Oil Company identifying Corporate Parent SCOGI GP, Corporate Parent Royal Dutch Shell plc for Shell Chemical LP, Shell Oil Company (Best, Mark)
August 24, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER and CLAIM to #1 Complaint, by Shell Chemical LP, Shell Oil Company.Attorney Mark Edward Best added to party Shell Chemical LP(pty:clm), Attorney Mark Edward Best added to party Shell Oil Company(pty:clm).(Best, Mark)
August 20, 2021 Filing 11 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #10 Ex Parte MOTION Lift Stay. Filing attorney should have selected No at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?'. Clerk took corrective action to set motion for submission on 9/15/2021 before Judge Martin L.C. Feldman. No further action is necessary. (sa)
August 19, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Lift Stay by Jacqueline Berard. Motion will be set for submission on 9/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Stipulations, #4 Proposed Order)(Finckbeiner, John) Modified text/submission on 8/20/2021 (sa).
August 12, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER and CLAIM to #1 Complaint, by Jacqueline Berard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letters of Testamentary) Attorney John Joseph Finckbeiner, Jr added to party Jacqueline Berard. (pty:clm).(Finckbeiner, John) Modified text/filers on 8/13/2021 (sa).
August 3, 2021 Filing 8 Application for Refund of Electronic Fees filed by Kirby Inland Marine, LP for the following reason: Double Payment; receipt number ALAEDC-8959138. (Ray, Robert)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #2 MOTION to Issue Notice to Claimants; Restrain Prosecution of Claims and Excuse Petitioner from Posting Security. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 7/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Claimants) (sa)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE due to Collateral Proceedings. Case transferred to Judge Martin L.C. Feldman and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Michael North no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 7/27/2021. (NEF: Judges Feldman and Currault)(ajn)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting #4 Motion to Supplement Motion. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 7/22/2021. (ajn)
July 21, 2021 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Amend/Correct #2 MOTION Issue Notice to Claimants; Restrain Prosecution of Claims and Excuse Petitioner from Posting Security by Kirby Inland Marine, LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit C)(Ray, Robert)
July 20, 2021 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (aj)
July 20, 2021 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION Issue Notice to Claimants; Restrain Prosecution of Claims and Excuse Petitioner from Posting Security by Kirby Inland Marine, LP. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Proposed Order)(Ray, Robert) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/22/2021: #7 Exhibit C) (ajn). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/27/2021: #8 Notice to Claimants) (sa).
July 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kirby Inland Marine, LP (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8959152) filed by Kirby Inland Marine, LP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Robert Patrick Ray added to party Kirby Inland Marine, LP(pty:selreq).(Ray, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: In the Matter of the Complaint of Kirby Inland Marine, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Kirby Inland Marine, LP
Represented By: Robert Patrick Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Florida Marine Transporters, LLC
Represented By: Corey Patrick Parenton
Represented By: James A. Crouch, Jr
Represented By: Jason R. Kenney
Represented By: Jessica Bankston Finley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Jacqueline Berard
Represented By: L. Eric Williams, Jr.
Represented By: John Joseph Finckbeiner, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Shell Chemical LP
Represented By: Monique M. Weiner
Represented By: Mark Edward Best
Represented By: Perrey S. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Shell Oil Company
Represented By: Monique M. Weiner
Represented By: Mark Edward Best
Represented By: Perrey S. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Florida Marine, LLC
Represented By: Anthony John Staines
Represented By: Corey Patrick Parenton
Represented By: James A. Crouch, Jr
Represented By: Jason R. Kenney
Represented By: Jessica Bankston Finley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: PBC Management, LLC
Represented By: Anthony John Staines
Represented By: Corey Patrick Parenton
Represented By: James A. Crouch, Jr
Represented By: Jason R. Kenney
Represented By: Jessica Bankston Finley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Florida Marine Transporters, Inc.
Represented By: Corey Patrick Parenton
Represented By: James A. Crouch, Jr
Represented By: Jason R. Kenney
Represented By: Jessica Bankston Finley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Murphy Oil USA Inc
Represented By: James M. Garner
Represented By: Brandon William Keay
Represented By: Christopher Chocheles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Cenac Towing Co., LLC
Represented By: Randolph J. Waits
Represented By: Mark Andrew Hill
Represented By: Matthew F Popp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?