In re: In the Matter of Florida Marine, LLC
Petitioner: Florida Marine, LLC, PBC Management, LLC and Florida Marine Transporters, LLC
Claimant: Jacqueline Berard, Shell Chemical LP, Shell Oil Company, Murphy Oil USA Inc and Cenac Towing Co., LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv01406
Filed: July 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Donna Phillips Currault
Referring Judge: Martin LC Feldman
2 Judge: Wendy B Vitter
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 00 U.S.C. ยง 0000
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES - IT IS ORDERED that civil actions 21-1349, 21-1372, and 21-1406 are hereby CONSOLIDATED. Unless otherwise ordered, all future filings relating to such cases shall be made in the master case: 21-1349. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 8/25/2021. (Ref: 21-1349, 21-1372, 21-1406) (sa)
August 24, 2021 Filing 14 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Shell Chemical LP, Shell Oil Company identifying Corporate Parent SCOGI GP, Corporate Parent Shell Oil Company, Corporate Parent Royal Dutch Shell plc for Shell Chemical LP; Corporate Parent SCOGI GP, Corporate Parent Royal Dutch Shell plc for Shell Oil Company (Best, Mark)
August 24, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint,, , ANSWER and CLAIM to #7 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint,, by Shell Chemical LP, Shell Oil Company.Attorney Mark Edward Best added to party Shell Chemical LP(pty:clm), Attorney Mark Edward Best added to party Shell Oil Company(pty:clm).(Best, Mark)
August 20, 2021 Filing 12 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #11 Ex Parte MOTION Lift Stay. **1. Filing attorney should have selected No at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?'. Clerk took corrective action to set motion for submission on 9/15/2021 before Judge Martin L.C. Feldman. **2. Document lists the incorrect District Judge. All future filings must reflect "Section F, Judge Martin L.C. Feldman." No further action necessary. (sa)
August 19, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Lift Stay by Jacqueline Berard. Motion will be set for submission on 9/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Stipulations, #4 Proposed Order)(Finckbeiner, John) Modified text/submission on 8/20/2021 (sa).
August 19, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint, by Jacqueline Berard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letters of Testamentary)(Finckbeiner, John)
August 19, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER and CLAIM to #1 Complaint, by Jacqueline Berard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letters of Testamentary, #2 Exhibit USCG Records) Attorney John Joseph Finckbeiner, Jr added to party Jacqueline Berard(pty:clm).(Finckbeiner, John) Modified on 8/20/2021 (sa).
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AMENDED ORDER DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF RESTRAINING ORDER AGAINST PROSECUTION OF CLAIMS. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 8/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Notice)(sa)
August 11, 2021 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENTAL AND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR EXONERATION FROM AND/OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY, filed by Florida Marine, LLC, PBC Management, LLC, Florida Marine Transporters, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Ad Interim Stipulation, #3 Letter of Undertaking, #4 Notice, #5 Proposed Order) (sa)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental and Amended Complaint for Exoneration. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 8/11/2021. (sa)
August 10, 2021 Filing 5 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental and Amended Complaint by Florida Marine, LLC, PBC Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Pleading, #4 Proposed Pleading, #5 Proposed Pleading, #6 Proposed Pleading, #7 Proposed Order)(Finley, Jessica)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Martin L.C. Feldman. Judge Wendy B Vitter no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 7/27/2021.(jeg)(NEF: Section F)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER APPROVING AFFIDAVIT OF VALUE, DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF NOTICE AND RESTRAINING PROSECUTION OF CLAIMS as set forth herein. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 7/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(jeg)
July 23, 2021 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Wendy B Vitter and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (go)
July 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR EXONERATION FROM AND/OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8964432) filed by Florida Marine, LLC, PBC Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Appendix, #4 Appendix, #5 Appendix, #6 Proposed Order, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Anthony John Staines added to party Florida Marine, LLC(pty:selreq), Attorney Anthony John Staines added to party PBC Management, LLC(pty:selreq).(Staines, Anthony) Modified text on 7/26/2021 (jeg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: In the Matter of Florida Marine, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Florida Marine, LLC
Represented By: Anthony John Staines
Represented By: Corey Patrick Parenton
Represented By: James A. Crouch, Jr
Represented By: Jason R. Kenney
Represented By: Jessica Bankston Finley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: PBC Management, LLC
Represented By: Anthony John Staines
Represented By: Corey Patrick Parenton
Represented By: James A. Crouch, Jr
Represented By: Jason R. Kenney
Represented By: Jessica Bankston Finley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Florida Marine Transporters, LLC
Represented By: Anthony John Staines
Represented By: Corey Patrick Parenton
Represented By: James A. Crouch, Jr
Represented By: Jason R. Kenney
Represented By: Jessica Bankston Finley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Jacqueline Berard
Represented By: L. Eric Williams, Jr.
Represented By: John Joseph Finckbeiner, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Shell Chemical LP
Represented By: Monique M. Weiner
Represented By: Mark Edward Best
Represented By: Perrey S. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Shell Oil Company
Represented By: Monique M. Weiner
Represented By: Mark Edward Best
Represented By: Perrey S. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Murphy Oil USA Inc
Represented By: James M. Garner
Represented By: Brandon William Keay
Represented By: Christopher Chocheles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Cenac Towing Co., LLC
Represented By: Randolph J. Waits
Represented By: Mark Andrew Hill
Represented By: Matthew F Popp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?