Falgout v. Anco Insulations Inc et al
Plaintiff: Ruby Lee Marie Falgout
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company as successor by merger to Maryland Casualty Company, CBS Corporation, Grinnell Corporation, Hopeman Brothers Inc, Goulds Pumps LLC, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, as Insurer of Wayne Manufacturing, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated/Northrop Grumman Shipbuilding, Inc., Albert L. Bossier, Jr., John David Roberts, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Travelers Indemnity Company, Cajun Company, ViacomCBS Inc, Avondale Industries, Inc., Eagle Asbestos & Packing Company, Inc., J D Roberts, OneBeacon Insurance Company, Commercial Union Insurance Company, Cajun Insulation Company, Zurich American Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Viacom, Inc. successor-by-merger with CBS Corporation, Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Northrop Grumman Ship Systems, Inc., Huntington Ingalls Incorporated and Grinnell LLC
Cross Defendant: Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc., Anco Insulations Inc, Eagle Inc, McCarty Corporation, Bayer CropScience, LP, Foster Wheeler LLC, General Electric Company, International Paper Company and Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust
3Rd Party Defendant: Uniroyal, Inc., Uniroyal Inc, Champion International Corporation, U.S. Plywood Corporation and Manville Personal Injury Trust
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Albert L Bossier, Jr
Case Number: 2:2021cv01443
Filed: July 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Carl Barbier
Referring Judge: Dana Douglas
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ANSWER to #22 Third Party Complaint by Uniroyal Inc.Attorney Mary Reeves Arthur added to party Uniroyal Inc(pty:crd).(Arthur, Mary)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc. (Lightfoot, Christopher)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER - CONSIDERING the issues presented by Hurricane Ida and its aftermath as well as the continuance of the Motion to Remand to State Court as to Avondale (Rec. Doc. 10); IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the submission date for Motion to Remand to State Court as to Hopeman Brothers (Rec. Doc. 12) is continued from September 22, 2021 toOctober 6, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 9/15/21.(cg)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand to Cross Claim of Huntington Ingalls, Inc. by Anco Insulations Inc.(Elliott, Douglas)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand to Cross Claim of Albert L. Bossier, Jr. by Anco Insulations Inc.(Elliott, Douglas)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Summons Issued as to Bayer CropScience, LP(successor to Rhone Poulenc AG Company, formerly Amchem Products, Inc., formerly Benjamin Foster Company), Foster Wheeler LLC, General Electric Company, International Paper Company, Manville Personal Injury Trust(a subsidiary of the Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust, administered through the Claims Resolution Management Corporation), Uniroyal, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(cg)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Request of Summons Issued as to Bayer CropScience, LP(successor to Rhone Poulenc AG Company, formerly Amchem Products, Inc., formerly Benjamin Foster Company), Bayer CropScience, LP, Foster Wheeler LLC, General Electric Company, International Paper Company, Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust, Manville Personal Injury Trust(a subsidiary of the Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust, administered through the Claims Resolution Management Corporation), Manville Personal Injury Trust, Uniroyal, Inc. filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #22 Third Party Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Summons Foster Wheeler LLC, #2 Summons General Electric Company, #3 Summons International Paper Company, #4 Summons The Manville Personal Injury Trust, #5 Summons Uniroyal, Inc.)(Melancon, David)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by International Paper Company (Penn, Elizabeth)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ANSWER to Complaint Cross-Claims of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by International Paper Company.Attorney Elizabeth Riddell Penn added to party International Paper Company(pty:crd).(Penn, Elizabeth)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #18 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. IT IS ORDERED that Amber L. Stewart is hereby withdrawn as counsel of record for Defendant, International Paper Company. It is further ordered that Amber L. Stewart be removed from receiving notification of filings through the CM/ECF system for this case. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 9/10/21. (cg)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Bayer CropScience, LP, Foster Wheeler LLC, General Electric Company, International Paper Company, Manville Personal Injury Trust, Uniroyal, Inc. filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated.(cg)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to File Third Party Complaint. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 9/9/21. (cg)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Attorney David Wayne O'Quinn for Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 9/9/21. (cg)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER - CONSIDERING the foregoing Consent Motion to Continue Submission Date and Oral Argument on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by Defendant, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated (Rec. Doc. 15); IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED, and the submission date for Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (Rec. Doc. 10) is continued from September 22, 2021 to October 6, 2021. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 9/9/21.(cg)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Amber L. Stewart as Attorney by International Paper Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Ex Parte Motion to Withdraw Amber L. Stewart as Counsel of Record)(Arthur, Mary)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Third Party Complaint by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Pleading Third Party Complaint, #4 Rule 7.6 Certificate)Attorney David Michael Melancon added to party Huntington Ingalls Incorporated(pty:crc).(Melancon, David)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record - David W. O'Quinn by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney David Michael Melancon added to party Huntington Ingalls Incorporated(pty:crc).(Melancon, David)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Submission Date and Oral Argument on Plaintiffs Motion to Remand by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Melancon, David)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE by Clerk re #11 and #13 Request/Statement of Oral Argument regarding #10 and #12 MOTIONS To Remand. Pursuant to Local Rule 78.1, these motions are set for hearing with oral argument on 9/22/2021 at 9:30 AM before Judge Carl J. Barbier. (cg)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by All Plaintiffs regarding #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court as to Hopeman Brothers (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Naman, Barrett)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Remand to State Court as to Hopeman Brothers by Ruby Lee Marie Falgout. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W, #25 Exhibit X, #26 Exhibit Y, #27 Exhibit Z, #28 Exhibit AA, #29 Exhibit BB, #30 Notice of Submission, #31 Proposed Order)(Naman, Barrett)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by All Plaintiffs regarding #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court as to Avondale (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Naman, Barrett)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Remand to State Court as to Avondale by Ruby Lee Marie Falgout. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W, #25 Exhibit X, #26 Notice of Submission, #27 Proposed Order)(Naman, Barrett)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Hopeman Brothers Inc (Ankersen, Brittney)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Notice of Compliance by Hopeman Brothers Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-K, #2 Exhibit L-R, #3 Exhibit S-X, #4 Exhibit Y-BB, #5 Exhibit CC-LL)(Ankersen, Brittney)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Grinnell Corporation.Attorney Lauren Ann McCulloch Semlinger added to party Grinnell Corporation(pty:dft).(Semlinger, Lauren)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Goulds Pumps LLC.Attorney Lauren Ann McCulloch Semlinger added to party Goulds Pumps LLC(pty:dft).(Semlinger, Lauren)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Joinder. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 8/6/2021. (cwa)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Joinder in Notice of Removal by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney David Michael Melancon added to party Huntington Ingalls Incorporated(pty:dft).(Melancon, David)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DIRECTIVES pursuant to 28:1447(b) by Clerk.(cg)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (go)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court for Orleans Parish, case number 2021-02210 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8973157) filed by Hopeman Brothers Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit 1, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Brittney Bullock Ankersen added to party Hopeman Brothers Inc(pty:dft).(Ankersen, Brittney)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Falgout v. Anco Insulations Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Anco Insulations Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Eagle Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: McCarty Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Bayer CropScience, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: General Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: International Paper Company
Represented By: Walter G. Watkins, III
Represented By: Daniel S Roberts
Represented By: Elizabeth Riddell Penn
Represented By: Mary Reeves Arthur
Represented By: Thomas Peyton Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruby Lee Marie Falgout
Represented By: Mickey P. Landry
Represented By: Barrett Naman
Represented By: Frank J. Swarr
Represented By: Jeffrey A. O'Connell
Represented By: Matthew C. Clark
Represented By: Philip C Hoffman
Represented By: Ryan Pete Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company as successor by merger to Maryland Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: Lacey Taylor McCoy
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Roth Martin Hainkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grinnell Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hopeman Brothers Inc
Represented By: Brittney Bullock Ankersen
Represented By: Kaye N. Courington
Represented By: Blaine Augusta Moore
Represented By: Jeffrey Matthew Burg
Represented By: Mathilde Villere Semmes
Represented By: Troy Nathan Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps LLC
Represented By: Lauren Ann McCulloch Semlinger
Represented By: Mitchell F Tedesco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, as Insurer of Wayne Manufacturing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntington Ingalls Incorporated/Northrop Grumman Shipbuilding, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert L. Bossier, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John David Roberts
Represented By: Ronald Dean Church, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London
Represented By: James R Logan, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company
Represented By: Kristopher T. Wilson
Represented By: Katherine Osborne Hannan
Represented By: Patricia Cowen Penton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cajun Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ViacomCBS Inc
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: Lacey Taylor McCoy
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Roth Martin Hainkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avondale Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle Asbestos & Packing Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J D Roberts
Represented By: Ronald Dean Church, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OneBeacon Insurance Company
Represented By: Kristopher T. Wilson
Represented By: Katherine Osborne Hannan
Represented By: Patricia Cowen Penton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commercial Union Insurance Company
Represented By: Kristopher T. Wilson
Represented By: Katherine Osborne Hannan
Represented By: Patricia Cowen Penton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cajun Insulation Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: Edward T. Hayes
Represented By: Lee M. LeBouef
Represented By: Marc E. Devenport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Kaye N. Courington
Represented By: Blaine Augusta Moore
Represented By: Brittney Bullock Ankersen
Represented By: Jeffrey Matthew Burg
Represented By: Mathilde Villere Semmes
Represented By: Troy Nathan Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom, Inc. successor-by-merger with CBS Corporation
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: Lacey Taylor McCoy
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Roth Martin Hainkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: Lacey Taylor McCoy
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Roth Martin Hainkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northrop Grumman Ship Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntington Ingalls Incorporated
Represented By: Gustave A. Fritchie, III
Represented By: Amanda Marie Crowley Fraser
Represented By: David Michael Melancon
Represented By: David Wayne O'Quinn
Represented By: Edward Winter Trapolin
Represented By: Laura Ashleigh Leggette
Represented By: Michael Scott Minyard
Represented By: Timothy Farrow Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grinnell LLC
Represented By: Lauren Ann McCulloch Semlinger
Represented By: Mitchell F Tedesco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Uniroyal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Uniroyal Inc
Represented By: Mary Reeves Arthur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Champion International Corporation
Represented By: Walter G. Watkins, III
Represented By: Amber L. Stewart
Represented By: Daniel S Roberts
Represented By: Elizabeth Riddell Penn
Represented By: Mary Reeves Arthur
Represented By: Thomas Peyton Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: U.S. Plywood Corporation
Represented By: Walter G. Watkins, III
Represented By: Amber L. Stewart
Represented By: Daniel S Roberts
Represented By: Elizabeth Riddell Penn
Represented By: Mary Reeves Arthur
Represented By: Thomas Peyton Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Manville Personal Injury Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Albert L Bossier, Jr
Represented By: Gustave A. Fritchie, III
Represented By: Amanda Marie Crowley Fraser
Represented By: David Michael Melancon
Represented By: Edward Winter Trapolin
Represented By: Laura Ashleigh Leggette
Represented By: Michael Scott Minyard
Represented By: Timothy Farrow Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?