Oates v. Louisiana State et al
Plaintiff: LaTroy K Oates
Defendant: Louisiana State
Respondent: Attorney General State of Louisiana
Case Number: 2:2021cv01610
Filed: August 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Wendy B Vitter
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2021 Filing 8 Return of Service of Habeas Corpus Response Order served on Jefferson Parish Clerk on 9/30/2021(jeg)
October 4, 2021 Filing 7 Return of Service of Habeas Corpus Response Order served on Jefferson Parish DA on 9/30/2021; served on LA Attorney General on 10/1/2021 (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Green Card for LA Atty General)(jeg)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Habeas Corpus Response Order that Attorney General for the State of Louisiana and the District Attorney for Jefferson Parish respond to the petition of Habeas Corpus within 30 days. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of Court serve, by certified mail, a copy of this application and this Order on the Attorney General for the State of Louisiana and the District Attorney and the Clerk of Court for Jefferson Parish, Louisiana. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the petitioner, LATROY K. OATES, may file a reply memorandum within thirty (30) days after the filing of the answer or response by the District Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas on 9/28/21.(cg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/28/2021: #1 Certified Receipts) (cg).
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas on 9/28/21. (cg)
September 24, 2021 Filing 4 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) (Filing fee $ 5) filed by LaTroy K Oates. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Cover Letter, #14 Civil Cover Sheet)(jeg)
August 26, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe COMPLAINT: re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254),. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 9/16/2021. (eb)
August 24, 2021 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appoint Counsel by LaTroy K Oates. Motion(s) referred to Dana Douglas. (eb)
August 24, 2021 Filing 1 ***DEFICIENT*** PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) filed by LaTroy K Oates. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Cover Letter, #14 Civil Cover Sheet)(eb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oates v. Louisiana State et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaTroy K Oates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General State of Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?