Graciani v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Sandy Catala Graciani
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2021cv01612
Filed: August 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Referring Judge: Sarah S Vance
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2021 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, United States Attorney General, United States Attorney's Office. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(lw)
September 20, 2021 Filing 12 Request of Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration filed by Sandy Catala Graciani re #8 Case Transferred In - District Transfer, #1 Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons as to United States Attorney's Office, #2 Proposed Summons as to United States Attorney General)(Wicklund, Edward)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Social Security Response Order that Plaintiff's BRIEF is due within 40 days after the defendant has filed his answer, and Defendant's REPLY BRIEF is due within 45 days after the plaintiffs brief is filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 9/15/2021.(jeg)(cc: AUSA, EDLA)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Edward A Wicklund. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 8/26/2021. (caa)
August 26, 2021 Filing 9 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-9013258) by Sandy Catala Graciani. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Misko, Benjamin)
August 25, 2021 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Western; Case Number 2:21-cv-02278. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received (sa)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Transfer Case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 8/24/2021. (crt,Miletello, A) [Transferred from lawd on 8/25/2021.]
August 16, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Eastern District of Louisiana by Sandy Catala Graciani. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Text of proposed order)(aty,Misko, Benjamin) Modified docket text on 8/16/2021 (Miletello, A). [Transferred from lawd on 8/25/2021.]
August 16, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #6 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Eastern District of Louisiana. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/16/2021. (crt,Miletello, A) [Transferred from lawd on 8/25/2021.]
August 5, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to US Attorney, US Attorney General and Comm of Social Security. (crt,Thomas, T) [Transferred from lawd on 8/25/2021.]
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 8/5/2021. (crt,Thomas, T) [Transferred from lawd on 8/25/2021.]
August 4, 2021 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 8/4/2021. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph) [Transferred from lawd on 8/25/2021.]
August 2, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Thomas, T) [Transferred from lawd on 8/25/2021.]
August 2, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sandy Catala Graciani. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 In Forma Pauperis, #2 Text of proposed order)(aty,Misko, Benjamin) [Transferred from lawd on 8/25/2021.]
August 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security (In Forma Pauperis status requested and/or granted) filed by Sandy Catala Graciani. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Notice of Appeals Council Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons)(Attorney Benjamin M Misko added to party Sandy Catala Graciani(pty:pla))(aty,Misko, Benjamin) [Transferred from lawd on 8/25/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graciani v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandy Catala Graciani
Represented By: Benjamin M. Misko
Represented By: Edward A Wicklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?