Wilmington Trust, National Association v. HM Hotel Owner, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Wilmington Trust, National Association
Defendant: HM Hotel Owner, LLC, HM Hotel Lessee, LLC, PM Hotel Owner, LLC and PM Hotel Lessee, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv01662
Filed: September 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Martin LC Feldman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Wilmington Trust, National Association. Motion(s) will be submitted on 12/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts, #3 Affidavit of Mike Jenkins In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, #4 Exhibit A to the Affidavit, #5 Exhibit B to the Affidavit, #6 Exhibit C to the Affidavit, #7 Exhibit D to the Affidavit, #8 Exhibit E to the Affidavit, #9 Exhibit F to the Affidavit, #10 Exhibit G to the Affidavit, #11 Exhibit H to the Affidavit, #12 Exhibit I to the Affidavit, #13 Proposed Order, #14 Notice of Submission)(Drell, Bradley)
November 3, 2021 Filing 17 **DEFICIENT** MOTION for Summary Judgment by Wilmington Trust, National Association. Motion(s) will be submitted on 12/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts, #3 Affidavit of Mike Jenkins In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, #4 Exhibit A to the Affidavit, #5 Exhibit B to the Affidavit, #6 Exhibit C to the Affidavit, #7 Exhibit D to the Affidavit, #8 Exhibit E to the Affidavit, #9 Exhibit F to the Affidavit, #10 Exhibit G to the Affidavit, #11 Exhibit H to the Affidavit, #12 Exhibit I to the Affidavit, #13 Proposed Order and Judgment)(Drell, Bradley) Modified on 11/4/2021 (sa).
November 3, 2021 Filing 16 **FILED IN ERROR** EXPARTE/CONSENT Ex Parte MOTION for Summary Judgment by Wilmington Trust, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts, #3 Affidavit of Mike Jenkins In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, #4 Exhibit A to the Affidavit, #5 Exhibit B to the Affidavit, #6 Exhibit C to the Affidavit, #7 Exhibit D to the Affidavit, #8 Exhibit E to the Affidavit, #9 Exhibit F to the Affidavit, #10 Exhibit G to the Affidavit, #11 Exhibit H to the Affidavit, #12 Exhibit I to the Affidavit, #13 Proposed Order and Judgment)(Drell, Bradley) Modified on 11/4/2021 (sa).
October 7, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by HM Hotel Lessee, LLC, HM Hotel Owner, LLC, PM Hotel Lessee, LLC, PM Hotel Owner, LLC.Attorney James M. Garner added to party HM Hotel Lessee, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney James M. Garner added to party HM Hotel Owner, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney James M. Garner added to party PM Hotel Lessee, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney James M. Garner added to party PM Hotel Owner, LLC(pty:dft).(Garner, James)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Amy Hatch for Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 10/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Notice) (sa)
September 30, 2021 Filing 13 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Amy E. Hatch (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-9046868) by Wilmington Trust, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Admission, #3 Consent to Electronic Filing, #4 Proposed Order)(Drell, Bradley) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/1/2021) (lw). Modified text on 10/1/2021 (lw).
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 9/29/2021.(sa)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER AND REASONS - IT IS ORDERED that the plaintiff's #6 ex parte emergency motion for appointment of a receiver is hereby GRANTED; the Order of Appointment of Receiver, which details the rights and responsibilities of the receiver, is hereby incorporated by reference and simultaneously filed into the record of this proceeding. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 9/29/2021. (sa)
September 24, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wilmington Trust, National Association in compliance with #8 Order by the Court to serve Defendants. (Drell, Bradley) Modified on 9/27/2021 (sa).
September 24, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed; HM Hotel Lessee, LLC served on 9/16/2021, answer due 10/7/2021; HM Hotel Owner, LLC served on 9/16/2021, answer due 10/7/2021; PM Hotel Lessee, LLC served on 9/16/2021, answer due 10/7/2021; PM Hotel Owner, LLC served on 9/16/2021, answer due 10/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Service - HM Hotel Lessee, LLC, #2 Service - PM Hotel Owner, LLC, #3 Service - PM Hotel Lessee, LLC)(Drell, Bradley)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #7 MOTION to Expedite Hearing. IT IS ORDERED that the Motion to Expedite is GRANTED, and that the Court will hold a hearing on Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Appointment of a Receiver (Dkt. No. #6 ) on the 29th day of September, 2021 on the papers. Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order and its Emergency Motion to Appoint Receiver on Defendants, which have not yet been served or appeared. Any opposition by Defendants to Plaintiff's emergency Motion shall be filed by September 27, 2021. No later than September 27, 2021, Plaintiff shall certify in the record that it has complied with this Order. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 9/23/2021.(sa)
September 22, 2021 Filing 7 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite Hearing re: #6 Emergency MOTION to Appoint Receiver by Wilmington Trust, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Drell, Bradley) Modified text/events on 9/23/2021 (sa).
September 22, 2021 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT Emergency MOTION to Appoint Receiver by Wilmington Trust, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order Exhibit A, #3 Affidavit Mike Jenkins, #4 Affidavit Grant Winemiller)(Drell, Bradley)
September 8, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to HM Hotel Lessee, LLC, HM Hotel Owner, LLC, PM Hotel Lessee, LLC, PM Hotel Owner, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(bw)
September 7, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Drell, Bradley)
September 7, 2021 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Martin L.C. Feldman and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (cc)
September 7, 2021 Filing 2 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Wilmington Trust, National Association identifying Corporate Parent M&T Bank Corporation for Wilmington Trust, National Association (Drell, Bradley)
September 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9018242) filed by Wilmington Trust, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Bradley Loy Drell added to party Wilmington Trust, National Association(pty:pla).(Drell, Bradley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilmington Trust, National Association v. HM Hotel Owner, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilmington Trust, National Association
Represented By: Bradley Loy Drell
Represented By: Amy Hatch
Represented By: Heather M. Mathews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HM Hotel Owner, LLC
Represented By: Leopold Z. Sher
Represented By: Christopher Chocheles
Represented By: James M. Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HM Hotel Lessee, LLC
Represented By: Leopold Z. Sher
Represented By: Christopher Chocheles
Represented By: James M. Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PM Hotel Owner, LLC
Represented By: Leopold Z. Sher
Represented By: Christopher Chocheles
Represented By: James M. Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PM Hotel Lessee, LLC
Represented By: Leopold Z. Sher
Represented By: Christopher Chocheles
Represented By: James M. Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?