Stewart et al v. Entergy Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Anthony J. Stewart, Diane Raley, Tomika Jordan, Sheena Altine, Tyelga J. Kearney, Phyllis Banks, Roslyn Robert, Chrishante Ruffin, Jason C. Tullos, Randolph H. Gonzales, Jr., 516 St. Philip, LLC, William A. Myers, Jr., William A. Myers, III, George Alvin Bouie doing business as Wilson's Shoe Repair, LLC, Vera Warren Williams doing business as Community Book Center, LLC, James Raley, Colleen Raley, Janet Kalanet, Keith Gelpi, Lexie Keys, Bailey Keys, Larry Guillory, Shelley Guillory, Andrew Cassara, Matador, LLC, We The People, LLC, Cure, LLC, Matador, LLC doing business as Val's, We The People, LLC doing business as Cain and Table, Cure, LLC doing business as Cure, Ryan Cooper, Joyce Watkins, Merch Dat, LLC and Carnival Collectibles LLC
Defendant: Entergy Corporation, Entergy New Orleans, LLC and Entergy Louisiana, L.L.C.
Case Number: 2:2021cv01834
Filed: October 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Eldon E Fallon
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2021 Filing 16 PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE NOTICE: A PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE will be held BY TELEPHONE on WEDNESDAY, DECEMBER 15, 2021, at 11:00AM, for the purpose of scheduling a pre-trial conference and trial on the merits and for a discussion of the status and discovery cut-off dates. Please use the following information to call in for the conference: Dial: 888-557-8511/Access code: 6655019. By Clerk.(cwa)
November 16, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, First Amended Class Action Petition for Damages by Entergy Corporation, Entergy Louisiana, L.L.C., Entergy New Orleans, LLC.(Paul, Matthew) Modified text on 11/17/2021 (cwa).
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the #13 motion to continue is GRANTED and that the submission date for the Plaintiffs' #11 Motion to Remand is reset for December 22, 2021. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/15/2021.(cwa)
November 11, 2021 Filing 13 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Submission Date on Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by Entergy Corporation, Entergy Louisiana, L.L.C., Entergy New Orleans, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Paul, Matthew)
November 8, 2021 Filing 12 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court. Filing attorney named incorrect judicial officer for submission/hearing in the Notice of Submission. Motion is to be heard before the District Judge. No further action is necessary. Additionally, attachments have duplicate descriptions. For attachments, select either a category OR enter a description, selecting both will result in duplicate docket text. Clerk took corrective action. (cwa)
November 5, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand to State Court by 516 St. Philip, LLC, Sheena Altine, Phyllis Banks, George Alvin Bouie, Andrew Cassara, Cure, LLC, Keith Gelpi, Randolph H. Gonzales, Jr, Larry Guillory, Shelley Guillory, Tomika Jordan, Janet Kalanet, Tyelga J. Kearney, Bailey Keys, Lexie Keys, Matador, LLC, William A. Myers, III, William A. Myers, Jr, Colleen Raley, Diane Raley, James Raley, Chrishante Ruffin, Anthony J. Stewart, Jason C. Tullos, Joyce Watkins, We The People, LLC, Vera Warren Williams. Motion(s) will be submitted on 12/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Submission, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5)(Brustowicz, Celeste) Modified text on 11/8/2021 (cwa).
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. IT IS ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and that the deadline for Entergy New Orleans, LLC, and Entergy Corporation to respond to the Petition and First Amended Petition is extended to November 16, 2021. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the deadline for Entergy Louisiana, LLC to respond to the Petition and First Amended Petition is extended to December 2, 2021. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 10/25/2021. (cwa)
October 25, 2021 Filing 8 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Proposed Order should be added as a separate attachment to the motion and not as part of the motion. Clerk took corrective action. No further action is necessary. (cwa)
October 22, 2021 Filing 7 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Entergy Corporation, Entergy Louisiana, L.L.C., Entergy New Orleans, LLC. (Dossier, Eva) (Main Document 7 replaced on 10/25/2021) (cwa). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/25/2021: #1 Proposed Order) (cwa).
October 7, 2021 Filing 6 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #5 Notice of Compliance. 1. Document should have been linked to another document by checking the box 'Should the document you are filing link to another document' or by selecting a related document on other appropriate screen. Clerk took corrective action by linking document 5 to document 1. (bw)
October 6, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Compliance by Entergy Corporation, Entergy Louisiana, L.L.C., Entergy New Orleans, LLC. (Paul, Matthew)
October 6, 2021 Filing 4 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Entergy New Orleans, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Entergy Corporation for Entergy New Orleans, LLC (Paul, Matthew)
October 6, 2021 Filing 3 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Entergy Louisiana, L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent Entergy Corporation for Entergy Louisiana, L.L.C. (Paul, Matthew)
October 6, 2021 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (go)
October 6, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, case number 2021-07365 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9054539) filed by Entergy Louisiana, L.L.C., Entergy Corporation, Entergy New Orleans, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Matthew J. Paul added to party Entergy Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew J. Paul added to party Entergy Louisiana, L.L.C.(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew J. Paul added to party Entergy New Orleans, LLC(pty:dft).(Paul, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stewart et al v. Entergy Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony J. Stewart
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Andrew K. Jacoby
Represented By: Barry J. Cooper, Jr
Represented By: Celeste Brustowicz
Represented By: Jack W. Harang
Represented By: Juan Anthony LaFonta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Raley
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Andrew K. Jacoby
Represented By: Barry J. Cooper, Jr
Represented By: Celeste Brustowicz
Represented By: Jack W. Harang
Represented By: Juan Anthony LaFonta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tomika Jordan
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Andrew K. Jacoby
Represented By: Barry J. Cooper, Jr
Represented By: Celeste Brustowicz
Represented By: Jack W. Harang
Represented By: Juan Anthony LaFonta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheena Altine
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Andrew K. Jacoby
Represented By: Barry J. Cooper, Jr
Represented By: Celeste Brustowicz
Represented By: Jack W. Harang
Represented By: Juan Anthony LaFonta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyelga J. Kearney
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Andrew K. Jacoby
Represented By: Barry J. Cooper, Jr
Represented By: Celeste Brustowicz
Represented By: Jack W. Harang
Represented By: Juan Anthony LaFonta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis Banks
Represented By: Andrew K. Jacoby
Represented By: Barry J. Cooper, Jr
Represented By: Celeste Brustowicz
Represented By: Jack W. Harang
Represented By: Juan Anthony LaFonta
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roslyn Robert
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Andrew K. Jacoby
Represented By: Barry J. Cooper, Jr
Represented By: Celeste Brustowicz
Represented By: Jack W. Harang
Represented By: Juan Anthony LaFonta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chrishante Ruffin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Andrew K. Jacoby
Represented By: Barry J. Cooper, Jr
Represented By: Celeste Brustowicz
Represented By: Jack W. Harang
Represented By: Juan Anthony LaFonta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason C. Tullos
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Andrew K. Jacoby
Represented By: Barry J. Cooper, Jr
Represented By: Celeste Brustowicz
Represented By: Jack W. Harang
Represented By: Juan Anthony LaFonta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randolph H. Gonzales, Jr.
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Andrew K. Jacoby
Represented By: Barry J. Cooper, Jr
Represented By: Celeste Brustowicz
Represented By: Jack W. Harang
Represented By: Juan Anthony LaFonta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 516 St. Philip, LLC
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Andrew K. Jacoby
Represented By: Barry J. Cooper, Jr
Represented By: Celeste Brustowicz
Represented By: Jack W. Harang
Represented By: Juan Anthony LaFonta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William A. Myers, Jr.
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Andrew K. Jacoby
Represented By: Barry J. Cooper, Jr
Represented By: Celeste Brustowicz
Represented By: Jack W. Harang
Represented By: Juan Anthony LaFonta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William A. Myers, III
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Andrew K. Jacoby
Represented By: Barry J. Cooper, Jr
Represented By: Celeste Brustowicz
Represented By: Jack W. Harang
Represented By: Juan Anthony LaFonta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Alvin Bouie doing business as Wilson's Shoe Repair, LLC
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Andrew K. Jacoby
Represented By: Barry J. Cooper, Jr
Represented By: Celeste Brustowicz
Represented By: Jack W. Harang
Represented By: Juan Anthony LaFonta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vera Warren Williams doing business as Community Book Center, LLC
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Andrew K. Jacoby
Represented By: Barry J. Cooper, Jr
Represented By: Celeste Brustowicz
Represented By: Jack W. Harang
Represented By: Juan Anthony LaFonta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Raley
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Andrew K. Jacoby
Represented By: Barry J. Cooper, Jr
Represented By: Celeste Brustowicz
Represented By: Jack W. Harang
Represented By: Juan Anthony LaFonta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colleen Raley
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Andrew K. Jacoby
Represented By: Barry J. Cooper, Jr
Represented By: Celeste Brustowicz
Represented By: Jack W. Harang
Represented By: Juan Anthony LaFonta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Kalanet
Represented By: Andrew K. Jacoby
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Barry J. Cooper, Jr
Represented By: Celeste Brustowicz
Represented By: Jack W. Harang
Represented By: Juan Anthony LaFonta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Gelpi
Represented By: Andrew K. Jacoby
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Barry J. Cooper, Jr
Represented By: Celeste Brustowicz
Represented By: Jack W. Harang
Represented By: Juan Anthony LaFonta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lexie Keys
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Andrew K. Jacoby
Represented By: Barry J. Cooper, Jr
Represented By: Jack W. Harang
Represented By: Celeste Brustowicz
Represented By: Juan Anthony LaFonta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bailey Keys
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Andrew K. Jacoby
Represented By: Barry J. Cooper, Jr
Represented By: Celeste Brustowicz
Represented By: Jack W. Harang
Represented By: Juan Anthony LaFonta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Guillory
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Andrew K. Jacoby
Represented By: Barry J. Cooper, Jr
Represented By: Celeste Brustowicz
Represented By: Jack W. Harang
Represented By: Juan Anthony LaFonta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelley Guillory
Represented By: Andrew K. Jacoby
Represented By: Barry J. Cooper, Jr
Represented By: Celeste Brustowicz
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Jack W. Harang
Represented By: Juan Anthony LaFonta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Cassara
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Andrew K. Jacoby
Represented By: Barry J. Cooper, Jr
Represented By: Celeste Brustowicz
Represented By: Jack W. Harang
Represented By: Juan Anthony LaFonta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matador, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: We The People, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cure, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matador, LLC doing business as Val's
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Andrew K. Jacoby
Represented By: Barry J. Cooper, Jr
Represented By: Celeste Brustowicz
Represented By: Jack W. Harang
Represented By: Juan Anthony LaFonta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: We The People, LLC doing business as Cain and Table
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Andrew K. Jacoby
Represented By: Barry J. Cooper, Jr
Represented By: Celeste Brustowicz
Represented By: Jack W. Harang
Represented By: Juan Anthony LaFonta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cure, LLC doing business as Cure
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Andrew K. Jacoby
Represented By: Barry J. Cooper, Jr
Represented By: Jack W. Harang
Represented By: Celeste Brustowicz
Represented By: Juan Anthony LaFonta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Cooper
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Andrew K. Jacoby
Represented By: Barry J. Cooper, Jr
Represented By: Celeste Brustowicz
Represented By: Jack W. Harang
Represented By: Juan Anthony LaFonta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Watkins
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Andrew K. Jacoby
Represented By: Barry J. Cooper, Jr
Represented By: Celeste Brustowicz
Represented By: Jack W. Harang
Represented By: Juan Anthony LaFonta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merch Dat, LLC
Represented By: Andrew K. Jacoby
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Barry J. Cooper, Jr
Represented By: Celeste Brustowicz
Represented By: Jack W. Harang
Represented By: Juan Anthony LaFonta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carnival Collectibles LLC
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Andrew K. Jacoby
Represented By: Barry J. Cooper, Jr
Represented By: Celeste Brustowicz
Represented By: Jack W. Harang
Represented By: Juan Anthony LaFonta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Entergy Corporation
Represented By: Matthew J. Paul
Represented By: Richard C. Stanley
Represented By: Cory R. Cahn
Represented By: Darryl M. Phillips
Represented By: Eva J. Dossier
Represented By: John P. D'Avello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Entergy New Orleans, LLC
Represented By: Matthew J. Paul
Represented By: Richard C. Stanley
Represented By: Cory R. Cahn
Represented By: Darryl M. Phillips
Represented By: Eva J. Dossier
Represented By: John P. D'Avello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Entergy Louisiana, L.L.C.
Represented By: Matthew J. Paul
Represented By: John P. D'Avello
Represented By: Richard C. Stanley
Represented By: Cory R. Cahn
Represented By: Darryl M. Phillips
Represented By: Eva J. Dossier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?