Dupre v. Webre et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Michael Dupre
Defendant: Craig Webre, Louisiana State, Nikita Zeringue, Lafourche Parish and Lafourche Parish Medical Department
Case Number: 2:2021cv01847
Filed: October 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Referring Judge: Jay C Zainey
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Louisiana State served on 11/23/2021, answer due 12/14/2021. (ajn)
October 14, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Lafourche Parish, Lafourche Parish Medical Department, Louisiana State, Craig Webre, Nikita Zeringue. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons) (2cc each: USM, with certified Pauper Order and Complaints)(ajn)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PAUPER ORDER Granting Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with a partial payment of $10.71 and directing the remainder of filing fee be made from Prisoner Account as to Matthew Michael Dupre in monthly payments as set out in document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 10/14/2021. (cc: Sheriff) (ajn)
October 7, 2021 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Matthew Michael Dupre. Motion(s) referred to Janis van Meerveld. (bwn)
October 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Matthew Michael Dupre. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(bwn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dupre v. Webre et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Michael Dupre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Webre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nikita Zeringue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lafourche Parish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lafourche Parish Medical Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?