Dean v. Lafourche Parish et al
Plaintiff: Albert Buddy Dean
Defendant: Lafourche Parish, Lafourche Parish Medical Department, Federal Emergency Management Agency, Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, Louisiana State and John Bel Edwards
Case Number: 2:2021cv01849
Filed: October 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Mary Ann Vial Lemmon
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2021 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that Plaintiff's #1 Complaint be dismissed with prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(i) and (ii), as set forth herein. Objections to R&R due by 12/2/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 11/18/2021.(jls)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PAUPER ORDER Granting Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with a partial payment of $6.88 and directing the remainder of filing fee be made from Prisoner Account as to Albert Buddy Dean in monthly payments as set out in document. The Clerk is directed to withhold issuance of summons until further order of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 10/13/2021. (NEF - Fin, US Mail - Sheriff)(caa)
October 7, 2021 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Albert Buddy Dean. Motion(s) referred to Michael North. (bwn)
October 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Albert Buddy Dean. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bwn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dean v. Lafourche Parish et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Buddy Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lafourche Parish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lafourche Parish Medical Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Emergency Management Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centers for Disease Control and Prevention
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Bel Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?