Ruppel v. Home Depot USA Inc
Plaintiff: Robert E Ruppel, Jr
Defendant: Home Depot USA Inc
Case Number: 2:2021cv01883
Filed: October 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Carl Barbier
Referring Judge: Dana Douglas
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2021 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Exhibit Under Seal by Home Depot USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Wilkerson, Lacresha) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/18/2021: #3 Proposed Sealed Exhibit G) (jls).
October 15, 2021 Filing 3 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Home Depot USA Inc. By the Clerk. (bw)
October 14, 2021 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (cc)
October 14, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, case number 20-10345 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9065270) filed by Home Depot USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E-1, #6 Exhibit E-2, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G - to be filed under seal, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Notice of Removal to State Court, #11 Notice of Removal to Plaintiff) Attorney Lacresha D. Wilkerson added to party Home Depot USA Inc(pty:dft).(Wilkerson, Lacresha) Modified text on 10/15/2021 (bw). Modified text on 10/18/2021 (jls).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruppel v. Home Depot USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert E Ruppel, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot USA Inc
Represented By: Lacresha D. Wilkerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?