Luckey v. Day et al
Plaintiff: Joshua Luckey
Defendant: Travis Day and Rayburn Correctional Center
Respondent: Attorney General State of Louisiana
Case Number: 2:2021cv01895
Filed: October 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Referring Judge: Donna Phillips Currault
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that petitioners Appendixes K, L, and M submitted with his petitionshall be maintained under SEAL pending further order of this Court. The Clerk of Court will provide service copies of the entire petition, including the sealed documents, to the Louisiana Attorney General and District Attorney as directed in the courts briefing to be issued only if this case is later opened. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 10/22/2021.(caa)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DENYING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 10/19/2021. (sa)
October 15, 2021 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joshua Luckey. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. (cwa)
October 15, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) filed by Joshua Luckey. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(cwa) (Attachment 2 replaced on 10/22/2021) (lag). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/22/2021: #4 SEALED Exhibits) (lag).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luckey v. Day et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Luckey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rayburn Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General State of Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?