King v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., et al
Plaintiff: Glen E King
Defendant: Anchor Darling Valve Company, A.W. Chesterton Company, Blackmer Pump Company, Crane Company, Dezurik, Inc., Fisher Controls International LLC, The Gorman Rupp Company, Goulds Pumps IPG, LLC, IMO Industries Inc, John Crane Inc, Shreveport Rubber & Gasket Co., Sterling Fluid Systems USA, LLC, Storer Equipment Company, LTD., Storer HVAC Management Corp., Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc., Tuthill Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, ViacomCBS Inc, Warren Pumps, LLC, Metropolitan Life Insurance, Foster Wheeler LLC, FMC Corporation, Peerless Pump Company, CBS Corporation, Viacom Inc, Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Warren Pumps Inc, Gorman Rupp Company and Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation
Case Number: 2:2021cv02006
Filed: November 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Sarah S Vance
2 Judge: Wendy B Vitter
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2021 Filing 25 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Fisher Controls International LLC identifying Corporate Parent Emerson Electric Co. for Fisher Controls International LLC (Bowlin, Angela)
December 22, 2021 Filing 24 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Dezurik, Inc. (Thibodeaux, Brandie)
December 22, 2021 Filing 23 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by Dezurik, Inc. Attorney Brandie Mendoza Thibodeaux added to party Dezurik, Inc. (pty:dft).(Thibodeaux, Brandie)
December 17, 2021 Filing 22 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #21 Initial Disclosures Purs Federal Rule 26(A)(1). Document has been stricken pursuant to Rule 5(d) of FRCP. (lw)
December 16, 2021 Filing 21 *STRICKEN* Initial Disclosures Purs Federal Rule 26(A)(1) by Glen E King (Dunn, Alex) Modified text on 12/17/2021 (lw).
November 30, 2021 Filing 20 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #19 Statement of Corporate Disclosure. Filing attorney has entered incorrect party in the title caption of the document. The correct case title caption should be Glen E. King v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., et al. All future filings need to reflect the correct case caption. (lw)
November 29, 2021 Filing 19 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc. (Lightfoot, Christopher)
November 18, 2021 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal by Anchor Darling Valve Company.(Adams, Jennifer) Modified text on 11/18/2021 (lw).
November 18, 2021 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal by Shreveport Rubber & Gasket Co.(Adams, Jennifer) Modified text on 11/18/2021 (lw).
November 18, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by John Crane Inc.(Corb, Natasha)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF RECUSAL. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of Court reallot this matter to another Section of this Court. Judge Wendy B Vitter recused. Case reassigned to Judge Sarah S. Vance. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 11/9/2021.(mmv) (NEF: J. Vance, Case Mgr, MJ Douglas)
November 8, 2021 Filing 14 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Metropolitan Life Insurance identifying Corporate Parent MetLife, Inc. for Metropolitan Life Insurance (Jalenak, Jay)
November 8, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal by Metropolitan Life Insurance. Attorney Jay Morton Jalenak, Jr added to party Metropolitan Life Insurance(pty:dft).(Jalenak, Jay) Modified text on 11/9/2021 (lw).
November 8, 2021 Filing 12 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Tuthill Corporation (Ziffer, Lee)
November 8, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Tuthill Corporation.(Ziffer, Lee)
November 5, 2021 Filing 10 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Gorman Rupp Company (Romero, Jacqueline)
November 5, 2021 Filing 9 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Crane Company (Romero, Jacqueline)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) GRANTING as unopposed #5 Motion for Leave to File Supplement Exhibit to its Notice of Removal. The Clerk's Office is directed to file R. Doc. 5-2 into the record as Exhibit H to the Notice of Removal (R. Doc. 1). Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 11/2/21. (fmm)
November 2, 2021 Filing 7 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal. **Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the Civil Cover Sheet. The pdf should not have the purple boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
November 2, 2021 Filing 6 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by John Crane Inc identifying Corporate Parent Smiths Group, plc for John Crane Inc (Corb, Natasha)
November 1, 2021 Filing 5 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Supplement Exhibits To Its Notice of Removal by John Crane Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit H)(Corb, Natasha)
November 1, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Compliance by John Crane Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-I, #2 Exhibit J-Q, #3 Exhibit R-Y, #4 Exhibit Z-BB, #5 Exhibit CC-DD, #6 Exhibit EE-FF, #7 Exhibit GG-XX)(Corb, Natasha)
November 1, 2021 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Wendy B Vitter and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (aj)
November 1, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE by John Crane Inc . (Corb, Natasha)
November 1, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, case number 2021-07248 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9089383) filed by John Crane Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G-State Record Ex. A-I, #8 Exhibit G-State Record Ex. J-Q, #9 Exhibit G-State Record Ex. R-Y, #10 Exhibit G-State Record Ex. Z-BB, #11 Exhibit G-State Record Ex. CC-DD, #12 Exhibit G-State Record Ex. EE-FF, #13 Exhibit G-State Record Ex. GG-XX, #14 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Natasha Amber Corb added to party John Crane Inc(pty:dft).(Corb, Natasha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glen E King
Represented By: Alex S. Dunn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anchor Darling Valve Company
Represented By: Jennifer E. Adams
Represented By: Amber B. Barlow
Represented By: Barbara Bourgeois Ormsby
Represented By: William Claudy Harrison, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. Chesterton Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackmer Pump Company
Represented By: Daniel E. Oser
Represented By: Kathleen Erin Jordan
Represented By: Thomas A. Porteous
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Company
Represented By: Lawrence Pugh, III
Represented By: Donna M. Young
Represented By: Jacqueline Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dezurik, Inc.
Represented By: Bradley Adam Hays
Represented By: Brandie Mendoza Thibodeaux
Represented By: Christopher O. Massenburg
Represented By: Danielle Mikel Sczesny
Represented By: Jeanette Seraile-Riggins
Represented By: Mary A. Reed
Represented By: Meghan B. Senter
Represented By: Natasha Amber Corb
Represented By: Glenn Lyle Maximilian Swetman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fisher Controls International LLC
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: Lacey Taylor McCoy
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Roth Martin Hainkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Gorman Rupp Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps IPG, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries Inc
Represented By: Daniel E. Oser
Represented By: Kathleen Erin Jordan
Represented By: Thomas A. Porteous
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane Inc
Represented By: Natasha Amber Corb
Represented By: Alexandra D. Bourbon
Represented By: Amanda Luella Deto
Represented By: Bradley Adam Hays
Represented By: Brandie Mendoza Thibodeaux
Represented By: Christopher O. Massenburg
Represented By: Danielle Mikel Sczesny
Represented By: Glenn Lyle Maximilian Swetman
Represented By: Jeanette Seraile-Riggins
Represented By: Mary A. Reed
Represented By: Meghan B. Senter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shreveport Rubber & Gasket Co.
Represented By: Barbara Bourgeois Ormsby
Represented By: William Claudy Harrison, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer E. Adams
Represented By: Amber B. Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sterling Fluid Systems USA, LLC
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: Lacey Taylor McCoy
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Roth Martin Hainkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Storer Equipment Company, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Storer HVAC Management Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Kelly Lightfoot
Represented By: Edward J. Lassus, Jr.
Represented By: Gabriel J. Veninata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tuthill Corporation
Represented By: Deborah DeRoche Kuchler
Represented By: Lee Blanton Ziffer
Represented By: Perrey S. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ViacomCBS Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance
Represented By: Jay Morton Jalenak, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick Dale Roquemore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peerless Pump Company
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: Lacey Taylor McCoy
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Roth Martin Hainkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gorman Rupp Company
Represented By: Lawrence Pugh, III
Represented By: Donna M. Young
Represented By: Jacqueline Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?