Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Ponchatoula Pub, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: Ponchatoula Pub, Inc. doing business as Ponchatoula Pub and Aaron Foret
Case Number: 2:2021cv02020
Filed: November 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Martin LC Feldman
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47 U.S.C. ยง 0605
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2021 Filing 19 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Ponchatoula Pub, Inc. (Holmes, Duris)
November 12, 2021 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Aaron Foret, Ponchatoula Pub, Inc..Attorney Duris Lee Holmes added to party Aaron Foret(pty:dft), Attorney Duris Lee Holmes added to party Ponchatoula Pub, Inc.(pty:dft).(Holmes, Duris)
November 4, 2021 Filing 17 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Middle; Case Number 3:21-cv-00320. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received (jls)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 GENERAL ORDER: All pleadings and other papers filed under seal in civil and criminal actions shall be maintained under seal for thirty days following final disposition of the action. After that time, all sealed pleadings and other papers shall be placed in the case record unless a District Judge or Magistrate Judge, upon motion and for good cause shown, orders that the pleading or other paper be maintained under seal. The deadline for filing any motions regarding the unsealing of any document shall be within thirty days of the final disposition of any action and shall contain a concise statement of reasons for maintaining the pleading or other paper under seal. ATTENTION: If a motion to retain documents under seal is NOT filed, all documents shall be placed in the public case record, unless specifically identified in the attached General Order Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 7/8/2019. (EDC) [Transferred from lamd on 11/4/2021.]
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order Transferring Case to the Eastern District of Louisiana. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 11/2/2021. (EDC) [Transferred from lamd on 11/4/2021.]
November 1, 2021 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of Louisiana by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Tarver, Dorothy) [Transferred from lamd on 11/4/2021.]
September 24, 2021 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. Waiver sent to Ponchatoula Pub, Inc. and Aaron Foret on 9/23/2021, answer due 11/22/2021. (Tarver, Dorothy) [Transferred from lamd on 11/4/2021.] Modified text on 11/4/2021 (jls).
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: The scheduling conference set for 9/30/2021 is re-set for 11/18/2021 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 11/4/2021. Failure to serve the defendants and failure to file the status report as ordered will result in the issuance of a show cause order and may result insanctions, up to and including dismissal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 9/21/2021. (SWE) [Transferred from lamd on 11/4/2021.]
September 16, 2021 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (ELW) [Transferred from lamd on 11/4/2021.]
September 15, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Submitted as to Ponchatoula Pub, Inc. (Tarver, Dorothy) [Transferred from lamd on 11/4/2021.]
September 15, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Submitted as to Aaron Foret (Tarver, Dorothy) [Transferred from lamd on 11/4/2021.]
August 8, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. Aaron Foret served on 7/26/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. (Tarver, Dorothy) [Transferred from lamd on 11/4/2021.]
July 30, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. Ponchatoula Pub, Inc. served on 7/26/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. (Tarver, Dorothy) [Transferred from lamd on 11/4/2021.] Modified event/text on 11/4/2021 (jls).
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Continue Status Conference. Considering defendants have not made an appearance, the telephone scheduling conference set for 8/19/2021 is RESET for 9/30/2021 at 10:30 AM. Counsel for plaintiff shall initiate the call to all parties, then contact the Court at 225-389-3602. A Joint Status Report is due on or before 9/16/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 7/26/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO) [Transferred from lamd on 11/4/2021.]
July 22, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Continue Status Conference by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Tarver, Dorothy) Modified on 7/22/2021 to edit text (SWE). [Transferred from lamd on 11/4/2021.]
July 22, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #5 MOTION to Continue Status Conference . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE) [Transferred from lamd on 11/4/2021.]
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: A Telephone Scheduling Conference is set for 8/19/2021 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 8/5/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 6/23/2021. (SGO) [Transferred from lamd on 11/4/2021.]
June 2, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (ELW) [Transferred from lamd on 11/4/2021.]
June 1, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Tarver, Dorothy) [Transferred from lamd on 11/4/2021.]
June 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Aaron Foret, Ponchatoula Pub, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2293955.), filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Summons-Aaron Foret, #3 Summons-Ponchatoula Pub)(Tarver, Dorothy) (Main Document 1, Attachment 1, 2 and 3 replaced on 6/2/2021) (ELW). Modified on 6/2/2021 to correct filing order and flatten documents (ELW). [Transferred from lamd on 11/4/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Ponchatoula Pub, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Dorothy L. Tarver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ponchatoula Pub, Inc. doing business as Ponchatoula Pub
Represented By: Duris Lee Holmes
Represented By: Jonathan M. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Foret
Represented By: Duris Lee Holmes
Represented By: Jonathan M. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?