City of Kenner v. Certain Underwriters at LLoyd's, London et al
Plaintiff: City of Kenner and Kenner City
Defendant: Certain Underwriters LLoyd's London, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, United Specialty Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, HDI Global Specialty SE, Old Republic Insurance Company, AmRisc, LLC and Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London
Counter Claimant: Steadfast Insurance Company and Safety Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2021cv02064
Filed: November 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Martin LC Feldman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 0205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2022 Filing 10 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #9 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Impastato, Dominick)
December 2, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and STAY Proceedings by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, HDI Global Specialty SE, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Old Republic Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Safety Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company. Motion(s) will be submitted on 1/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Proposed Order)(Rew, Phillip) Modified on 12/3/2021 (sa).
November 26, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to AmRisc, LLC by All Plaintiffs. (Impastato, Dominick) Modified on 11/29/2021 (sa).
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to AmRisc, LLC. Answer due date EXTENDED through 11/29/2021. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 11/16/2021. (sa)
November 15, 2021 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,, by AmRisc, LLC. (Yanez, Leopoldo) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/16/2021: #1 Proposed Order) (sa). Modified to split out proposed order on 11/16/2021 (sa).
November 11, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Compliance with 28 U.S.C. 1447(b) re: #1 Notice of removal, by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, HDI Global Specialty SE, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Old Republic Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Safety Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Rew, Phillip) Modified on 11/12/2021 (sa).
November 9, 2021 Filing 4 DIRECTIVE of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by HDI Global Specialty SE, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London. Issued by Clerk. (sa)
November 9, 2021 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Martin L.C. Feldman and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (cc)
November 8, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against City of Kenner by General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, Old Republic Insurance Company, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company, Safety Specialty Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters LLoyd's London, Lexington Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, HDI Global Specialty SE, Steadfast Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Arbitration Clause, #2 Exhibit 2 Policy)Attorney Phillip J. Rew added to party General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona(pty:dft), Attorney Phillip J. Rew added to party Indian Harbor Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Phillip J. Rew added to party Lexington Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Phillip J. Rew added to party Old Republic Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Phillip J. Rew added to party QBE Specialty Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Phillip J. Rew added to party Safety Specialty Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Phillip J. Rew added to party Steadfast Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Phillip J. Rew added to party United Specialty Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Rew, Phillip)
November 8, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 24th Judicial District Court, case number 821-592 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9099879) filed by Certain Underwriters LLoyd's London, HDI Global Specialty SE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Phillip J. Rew added to party Certain Underwriters LLoyd's London(pty:dft), Attorney Phillip J. Rew added to party HDI Global Specialty SE(pty:dft).(Rew, Phillip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Kenner v. Certain Underwriters at LLoyd's, London et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Kenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenner City
Represented By: Dominick F. Impastato, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters LLoyd's London
Represented By: Phillip J. Rew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indian Harbor Insurance Company
Represented By: Phillip J. Rew
Represented By: D. Russell Holwadel
Represented By: Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr.
Represented By: Heather England Reznik
Represented By: Kyle M. Truxillo
Represented By: Richard R. Stedman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QBE Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Phillip J. Rew
Represented By: D. Russell Holwadel
Represented By: Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr.
Represented By: Heather England Reznik
Represented By: Kyle M. Truxillo
Represented By: Richard R. Stedman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona
Represented By: Phillip J. Rew
Represented By: D. Russell Holwadel
Represented By: Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr.
Represented By: Heather England Reznik
Represented By: Kyle M. Truxillo
Represented By: Richard R. Stedman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Phillip J. Rew
Represented By: D. Russell Holwadel
Represented By: Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr.
Represented By: Heather England Reznik
Represented By: Kyle M. Truxillo
Represented By: Richard R. Stedman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Company
Represented By: Phillip J. Rew
Represented By: D. Russell Holwadel
Represented By: Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr.
Represented By: Heather England Reznik
Represented By: Kyle M. Truxillo
Represented By: Richard R. Stedman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HDI Global Specialty SE
Represented By: Phillip J. Rew
Represented By: D. Russell Holwadel
Represented By: Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr.
Represented By: Heather England Reznik
Represented By: Kyle M. Truxillo
Represented By: Richard R. Stedman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Republic Insurance Company
Represented By: Phillip J. Rew
Represented By: D. Russell Holwadel
Represented By: Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr.
Represented By: Heather England Reznik
Represented By: Kyle M. Truxillo
Represented By: Richard R. Stedman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmRisc, LLC
Represented By: Nancy Scott Degan
Represented By: Leopoldo J Yanez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London
Represented By: D. Russell Holwadel
Represented By: Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr.
Represented By: Heather England Reznik
Represented By: Kyle M. Truxillo
Represented By: Phillip J. Rew
Represented By: Richard R. Stedman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Steadfast Insurance Company
Represented By: Phillip J. Rew
Represented By: D. Russell Holwadel
Represented By: Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr.
Represented By: Heather England Reznik
Represented By: Kyle M. Truxillo
Represented By: Richard R. Stedman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Safety Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Phillip J. Rew
Represented By: D. Russell Holwadel
Represented By: Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr.
Represented By: Heather England Reznik
Represented By: Kyle M. Truxillo
Represented By: Richard R. Stedman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?