Halstead Bead, Inc. v. Lewis et al
Plaintiff: Halstead Bead, Inc.
Defendant: Kimberly Lewis, Amanda Granier, Donna Drude, Jamie Butts, Lafourche Parish, Tangipahoa Parish and Washington Parish
Case Number: 2:2021cv02106
Filed: November 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) granting #46 Motion to Withdraw Patrick Amedee as Attorney for Jamie Butts. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 1/11/2022. (ecm)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Kimberly Lewis. Motion(s) will be submitted on 1/26/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Stutes, Russell) Modified date/text on 1/10/2022 (lw).
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Patrick Amedee as Attorney by Jamie Butts. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lagarde, Ross)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER GRANTING #41 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Joint Motion to Dismiss. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff Halstead Bead will have until 2/1/2022, to respond to the Joint Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12. The submission date of the #43 Joint Motion to Dismiss will now be 2/9/2022. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 12/29/2021.(pp)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) granting #37 Motion to Substitute Attorney Drew M. Talbot as counsel of record for defendant Donna Drude. Attorney Patrick M. Amedee terminated. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 12/28/2021. (ecm)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12 by Jamie Butts, Donna Drude, Amanda Granier. Motion(s) will be submitted on 1/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Notice of Submission, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C)Attorney Patrick M. Amedee added to party Jamie Butts(pty:dft).(pp)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER GRANTING #38 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion and Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, filed by Defendants, be filed into the record in the above-captioned matter. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 12/27/2021. (pp)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Joint Motion to Dismiss by Halstead Bead, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Henchman, Joseph) Modified text on 12/27/2021 (lw).
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #39 First MOTION to Dismiss Case. 1. Document incorrectly filed as a separate entry. Document is correctly attached to rec doc #38 as proposed pleading. For future filings, the proposed pleading should only be filed as an attachment to the motion and not as a separate entry. No further action necessary. 2. Notice of Submission should be filed as a separate attachment to the Motion. Clerk took corrective action by separating this document(s) and docketing it as a separate attachment. 3. Attachment has duplicate description. For attachment, select either a category OR enter a description, but not both since this results in duplicate text. Clerk took corrective action. (lw)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 *ERROR: Filed Separately, see doc. 38* First MOTION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP Rule 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6), First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim pursuant to FRCP Rule 12(B)(6), First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction pursuant to FRCP Rule 12(b)(1) by Jamie Butts, Donna Drude, Amanda Granier. Motion(s) will be submitted on 12/22/2021. Motion(s) will be submitted on 1/26/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Amanda Granier, #3 Affidavit Affidavit of Donna Drude, #4 Affidavit Affidavit of Jamie Butts, #5 Proposed Order)(Amedee, Patrick) Modified text on 12/22/2021 (lw).
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 EXPARTE/CONSENT First MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages of Mover's Memorandum in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss by Jamie Butts, Donna Drude, Amanda Granier. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Amedee, Patrick) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/22/2021: #3 Proposed Motion to Dismiss, #4 Proposed Memo in Support, #5 Affidavit of Amanda Granier, #6 Affidavit of Donna Drude, #7 Affidavit of Jamie Butts, #8 Notice of Submission (Civil Only), #9 Proposed Order) (lw).
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Drew M. Talbot to be substituted in place of Patrick M. Amedee by Donna Drude. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (Talbot, Drew) Modified text on 12/22/2021 (lw).
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 DEFICIENT: MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Donna Drude. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. Attorney Drew M. Talbot added to party Donna Drude(pty:dft).(Talbot, Drew) Modified text on 12/22/2021 (lw).
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) granting #33 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint, as to Donna Drude answer due 1/7/2022; Amanda Granier answer due 1/7/2022. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 12/21/21. (ecm)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #33 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer #2 Complaint. Documents was image as 8-1/2 x 14. All documents should be 8-1/2 x 11. Clerk has corrected the image. (lw)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer #2 Complaint by Donna Drude, Amanda Granier. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Patrick M. Amedee added to party Donna Drude(pty:dft), Attorney Patrick M. Amedee added to party Amanda Granier(pty:dft).(Amedee, Patrick) (Main Document 33 replaced on 12/15/2021) (lw). (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/15/2021) (lw). Modified text on 12/15/2021 (lw).
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) granting #29 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint, as to Kimberly Lewis answer due 1/7/2022. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 12/13/2021. (ecm)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #29 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer #2 Complaint. Filing attorney should have selected Yes at the question Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N? Clerk modified docket text to reflect Exparte. Also, Filing attorney incorrectly changed N to Y at the question, Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N? This motion will be decided by the District Judge. Clerk took corrective action. (lw)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) granting #27 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint, as to Jamie Butts, who shall have up to and including 12/23/2021 in which to move, answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 12/13/2021. (ecm)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer #2 Complaint by Kimberly Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Russell Stutes, III added to party Kimberly Lewis(pty:dft).(Stutes, Russell) Modified text on 12/13/2021 (lw).
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #27 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Move or Otherwise Respond to #1 Complaint. Filing attorney should have selected Yes at the question Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N? Exparte/Consent Motions are not set for submission. Clerk modified docket text to reflect Exparte and remove submission date. Filing attorney incorrectly changed N to Y at the question, Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N? This motion will be decided by the District Judge. Clerk took corrective action. (lw)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Move or Otherwise Respond to #1 Complaint by Jamie Butts. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order)Attorney Ross Forrest Lagarde added to party Jamie Butts(pty:dft).(Lagarde, Ross) Modified text on 12/10/2021 (lw).
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Jamie Butts served on 11/23/2021, answer due 12/14/2021. (Harbison, Sarah) Modified text on 12/7/2021 (lw).
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Kimberly Lewis served on 11/19/2021, answer due 12/10/2021 (Harbison, Sarah) Modified text on 12/7/2021 (lw).
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Amanda Granier served on 11/19/2021, answer due 12/10/2021. (Harbison, Sarah) Modified text on 12/7/2021 (lw).
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Donna Drude served on 11/22/2021, answer due 12/13/2021. (Harbison, Sarah) Modified text on 12/7/2021 (lw).
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 **DEFICIENT**SUMMONS Returned Executed; Kimberly Lewis served on 11/19/2021, answer due 12/10/2021. (Harbison, Sarah) Modified text on 12/2/2021 (am).
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 **DEFICIENT**SUMMONS Returned Executed; Jamie Butts served on 11/23/2021, answer due 12/14/2021. (Harbison, Sarah) Modified text on 12/2/2021 (am).
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 **DEFICIENT**SUMMONS Returned Executed; Donna Drude served on 11/22/2021, answer due 12/13/2021. (Harbison, Sarah) Modified text on 12/2/2021 (am).
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 **DEFICIENT**SUMMONS Returned Executed; Amanda Granier served on 11/19/2021, answer due 12/10/2021. (Harbison, Sarah) Modified text on 12/2/2021 (am).
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Joseph Henchman. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 11/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Vice Notice) (am)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jacob Huebert. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 11/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Vice Notice) (am)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Tyler Leandro Martinez. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 11/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Vice Notice) (am)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Jamie Butts, Donna Drude, Amanda Granier, Kimberly Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(am)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 **FILED IN ERROR - ATTACHED TO REC. DOC. 3** MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Tyler Martinez (Fee previously paid) by Halstead Bead, Inc.. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. Motion(s) will be submitted on 11/15/2021. (Harbison, Sarah) Modified text on 11/16/2021 (am).
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 **FILED IN ERROR - ATTACHED TO REC. DOC. 4** MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Joseph Bishop Henchman (Fee previously paid) by Halstead Bead, Inc.. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. Motion(s) will be submitted on 11/15/2021. (Harbison, Sarah) Modified text on 11/16/2021 (am).
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 **FILED IN ERROR - ATTACHED TO REC. DOC. 5** MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jacob Huebert (Fee previously paid) by Halstead Bead, Inc.. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. Motion(s) will be submitted on 11/15/2021. (Harbison, Sarah) Modified text on 11/16/2021 (am).
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 **FILED IN ERROR - ATTACHED TO REC. DOC. 5** MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jacob Huebert (Fee previously paid) by Halstead Bead, Inc.. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. Motion(s) will be submitted on 11/15/2021. (Harbison, Sarah) Modified text on 11/16/2021 (am).
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Request of Summons Issued as to Kimberly Lewis filed by Halstead Bead, Inc. re #2 Complaint,. (Harbison, Sarah)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Request of Summons Issued as to Amanda Granier filed by Halstead Bead, Inc. re #2 Complaint,. (Harbison, Sarah)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Request of Summons Issued as to Donna Drude filed by Halstead Bead, Inc. re #2 Complaint,. (Harbison, Sarah)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Request of Summons Issued as to Jamie Butts filed by Halstead Bead, Inc. re #2 Complaint,. (Harbison, Sarah)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (go)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jacob Huebert (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-9106836) by Halstead Bead, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Declaration, #3 Certificate of Service)(Harbison, Sarah) Modified text/removed submission date on 11/16/2021 (am). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/16/2021: #4 Proposed Order) (am). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/16/2021: #5 Consent to Electronic Filing) (am).
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Joseph Bishop Henchman (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-9106831) by Halstead Bead, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Declaration, #3 Consent to Electronic Filing, #4 Certificate of Service)(Harbison, Sarah) Modified text/removed submission date on 11/16/2021 (am). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/16/2021: #5 Proposed Order) (am).
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tyler Martinez (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-9106813) by Halstead Bead, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Declaration, #3 Consent to Electronic Filing, #4 Certificate of Service)(Harbison, Sarah) Modified text/removed submission date on 11/16/2021 (am). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/16/2021: #5 Proposed Order) (am).
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9106796) filed by Halstead Bead, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)Attorney Sarah R Harbison added to party Halstead Bead, Inc. (pty:pla).(Harbison, Sarah)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Defendants . (Harbison, Sarah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Halstead Bead, Inc. v. Lewis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Halstead Bead, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah R Harbison
Represented By: Jacob Huebert
Represented By: Joseph Henchman
Represented By: Tyler Leandro Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Lewis
Represented By: Russell J. Stutes, Jr.
Represented By: Russell Stutes, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Granier
Represented By: Patrick M. Amedee
Represented By: Catherine Chambers Masterson
Represented By: Joseph Zachary Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Drude
Represented By: Drew M. Talbot
Represented By: Patrick M. Amedee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Butts
Represented By: Ross Forrest Lagarde
Represented By: Alexander L. Reed
Represented By: Jeffrey G. Lagarde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lafourche Parish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tangipahoa Parish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Parish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?