Leboeuf v. Bickham et al
Plaintiff: Rusty J. Leboeuf
Defendant: Dustin Bickham
Respondent: Attorney General State of Louisiana
Case Number: 2:2021cv02147
Filed: November 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Susie Morgan
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Habeas Corpus Response Order that Attorney General for the State of Louisiana and the District Attorney for Lafourche Parish respond to the petition of Habeas Corpus within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 1/5/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipts sent to Clerk, D.A., Attorney General)(caa)
December 6, 2021 Filing 3 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) (Filing fee $ 5 LAE070493) filed by Rusty J. Leboeuf. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Cover Letter, #12 Civil Cover Sheet)(pp)
December 6, 2021 Filing fee paid re #3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254), (Filing fee $ 5 LAE070493) (pp)
November 22, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe COMPLAINT: re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254). Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 12/13/2021. (aj)
November 17, 2021 Filing 1 ***DEFICIENT*** PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) filed by Rusty J. Leboeuf. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Cover Letter, #12 Civil Cover Sheet)(aj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leboeuf v. Bickham et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rusty J. Leboeuf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin Bickham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General State of Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?