Richardson v. Day et al
Plaintiff: Eric Richardson
Defendant: Travis Day
Respondent: Attorney General State of Louisiana
Case Number: 2:2021cv02154
Filed: November 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Referring Judge: Jay C Zainey
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2022 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT First MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254),, by Travis Day. Motion(s) referred to Janis van Meerveld. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Juliet L. Clark added to party Travis Day(pty:dft).(Clark, Juliet)
January 5, 2022 Filing 5 Return of Service of H.C. Response Order served on D.A. Office on 12/29/2021.(ajn)
December 23, 2021 Filing 4 Return of Service of H.C. Response Order served on Attorney General's Office on 12/20/2021.(ajn)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Habeas Corpus Response Order that Attorney General for the State of Louisiana, the District Attorney and the Clerk of Court for Jefferson Parish respond to the petition of Habeas Corpus within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 12/16/2021.(ajn) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/17/2021: #1 Certified Mail Receipts) (ajn).
December 10, 2021 Filing fee paid from Eric Richardson re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254), (Filing fee $5 - Receipt #LAE070659) (ajn)
November 23, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe COMPLAINT: re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254). Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 12/14/2021. (aj)
November 18, 2021 Filing 1 ***DEFICIENT*** PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) filed by Eric Richardson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit, #28 Civil Cover Sheet)(aj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richardson v. Day et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Day
Represented By: Juliet L. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General State of Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?