Sewell v. St. Bernard Parish Government
Plaintiff: Mr. Barry Sewell and Barry Sewell
Defendant: St. Bernard Parish Government
Case Number: 2:2021cv02376
Filed: December 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Referring Judge: Wendy B Vitter
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) GRANTING #10 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record. David C. Jarrell shall be enrolled as counsel of record for defendant, St. Bernard Parish Government. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 2/17/22. (fmm)
February 16, 2022 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, #6 Amended Complaint, , ANSWER to #1 Complaint, #6 Amended Complaint, by St. Bernard Parish Government.(Jarrell, David)
February 16, 2022 Filing 10 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record by St. Bernard Parish Government. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney David C. Jarrell added to party St. Bernard Parish Government(pty:dft).(Jarrell, David)
January 3, 2022 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to St. Bernard Parish Government. (jeg)
January 3, 2022 Filing 8 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #6 Amended Complaint. **Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the summons. The pdf should not have the purple boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. Please ensure that ALL future pleadings are properly formatted.** (jeg)
January 3, 2022 Filing 7 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #6 Amended Complaint. **Attachment has duplicate description. For attachment, select either a category OR enter a description, but not both since this results in duplicate docket text. Clerk took corrective action. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
December 30, 2021 Filing 6 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against St. Bernard Parish Government filed by Barry Sewell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A in globo to First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B to First Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit C to First Amended Complaint , #4 Summons)(Breithaupt, Robert) Modified text/attachment descriptions on 1/3/2022 (jeg). (Attachment 4 replaced on 1/3/2022) (jeg).
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff, Barry Sewell, shall have seven (7) days from the date of this Order to file a comprehensive amended Complaint, without further leave of Court, as set forth herein. Failure to comply with this Order may result in dismissal of the Complaint. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 12/28/2021.(jeg)
December 27, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to St. Bernard Parish Government. (jeg)
December 27, 2021 Filing 3 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. **Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the summons. The pdf should not have the purple boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
December 23, 2021 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Wendy B Vitter and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (ess)
December 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against St. Bernard Parish Government (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9158341) filed by Barry Sewell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A 29 pages of invoices, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B 2 pages of invoices, #3 Exhibit 11-5-2021 Demand Letter, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons)Attorney Robert A. Breithaupt added to party Barry Sewell(pty:pla).(Breithaupt, Robert) (Attachment 5 replaced on 12/27/2021) (jeg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sewell v. St. Bernard Parish Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Barry Sewell
Represented By: Robert A. Breithaupt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Sewell
Represented By: Robert A. Breithaupt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Bernard Parish Government
Represented By: David C. Jarrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?