Gerrets et al v. Capital One National Association et al
Plaintiff: Virginia Ann Signorelli Gerrets and Vincent J. Signorelli
Defendant: Capital One National Association, Joseph Pappalardo, Sr. and Latter & Blum Property Management, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv02387
Filed: December 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Donna Phillips Currault
Referring Judge: Ivan LR Lemelle
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2022 Filing 16 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition to re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by All Plaintiffs . (Sprague, Jeremiah) Modified text on 2/23/2022 (pp).
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS ORDERED that Michelle D. Gambino is hereby ADMITTED to practice before this court pro hac vice and is hereby ENROLLED as counsel of record for defendant Capital One National Association in the above-captioned matter. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 2/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Notice) (pp)
February 11, 2022 Filing 14 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice regarding Michelle Gambino (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-9223439) by Capital One National Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit, #3 Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Certificate of Good Standing, #6 Certificate of Good Standing, #7 ECF Registration Form)(Rookard, Kelly)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #12 MOTION to Continue. IT IS ORDERED that the submission date for defendants' #11 motion to dismiss set for 2/16/2022 is hereby CONTINUED AND RESET for Wednesday, 3/2/2022. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 2/11/2022.(pp)
February 10, 2022 Filing 12 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Hearing, or Alternatively, Motion for Leave to File Untimely Opposition Memorandum by Virginia Ann Signorelli Gerrets, Vincent J. Signorelli. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Falcon, Timothy)
January 25, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Capital One National Association. Motion(s) will be submitted on 2/16/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Notice of Submission)(Rookard, Kelly)
January 12, 2022 Filing 10 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #9 Notice of Compliance.**Document should have been linked to another document by checking the box 'Should the document you are filing link to another document' or by selecting a related document on other appropriate screen. Clerk took corrective action by linking document 9 to document 1. No further action necessary.** (pp)
January 11, 2022 Filing 9 Notice of Compliance re #1 Notice of Removal by Capital One National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Rookard, Kelly) Modified link/text on 1/12/2022 (pp).
January 11, 2022 Filing 8 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Capital One National Association identifying Corporate Parent Capital One Financial Corporation for Capital One National Association (Rookard, Kelly)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal. IT IS ORDERED that the Defendant shall file its responsive pleadings no later than Tuesday, 1/25/2022. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 1/4/2022. (pp)
January 4, 2022 Filing 6 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer . **Document should have been linked to another document by checking the box 'Should the document you are filing link to another document' or by selecting a related document on other appropriate screen. Clerk took corrective action by linking document 5 to document 1. No further action necessary. ** (pp)
January 3, 2022 Filing 5 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal by Capital One National Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rookard, Kelly) Modified text/link on 1/4/2022 (pp).
December 29, 2021 Filing 4 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal.(pp)
December 28, 2021 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (go)
December 28, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet Submitted (Rookard, Kelly)
December 28, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, case number 2021-09055 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9161056) filed by Capital One National Association. (Attachments: #1 Ex.1: Citation and Petition)Attorney Kelly Juneau Rookard added to party Capital One National Association(pty:dft).(Rookard, Kelly) (Main Document 1 replaced on 12/29/2021) (pp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gerrets et al v. Capital One National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Ann Signorelli Gerrets
Represented By: Jeremiah A. Sprague
Represented By: Brennan L Falcon
Represented By: Cameron J. Falcon
Represented By: Jarrett S. Falcon
Represented By: Timothy John Falcon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent J. Signorelli
Represented By: Jeremiah A. Sprague
Represented By: Brennan L Falcon
Represented By: Cameron J. Falcon
Represented By: Jarrett S. Falcon
Represented By: Timothy John Falcon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One National Association
Represented By: Kelly Juneau Rookard
Represented By: Brian Gerard Reaney, II
Represented By: McDonald Provosty
Represented By: Michelle D. Gambino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Pappalardo, Sr.
Represented By: Michael Steven Ricci
Represented By: Brian G. LeBon, Jr.
Represented By: James A. Gonczi
Represented By: Jonathan L Schultis
Represented By: Sara Elizabeth Huffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Latter & Blum Property Management, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Steven Ricci
Represented By: Brian G. LeBon, Jr.
Represented By: James A. Gonczi
Represented By: Jonathan L Schultis
Represented By: Sara Elizabeth Huffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?