Gardebled v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Estate if Judy Gardebled and Judy Gardebled
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company and State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Case Number: 2:2022cv00115
Filed: January 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Nannette Jolivette Brown
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, as to State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. Answer due 3/2/2022. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on February 9, 2022. (mp)
February 9, 2022 Filing 8 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company for State Farm Fire & Casualty Company (Strauss, David)
February 9, 2022 Filing 7 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 LR 7.8 Certificate, #2 Proposed Order)Attorney David A. Strauss added to party State Farm Fire & Casualty Company(pty:dft).(Strauss, David)
February 1, 2022 Filing 6 Memorandum by Judy Gardebled pursuant to #5 Order Demonstrating Diverse Citizenship. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Chopin, Justin) Modified text on 2/2/2022 (jls).
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff submit briefing regarding the citizenship of Defendant within 14 days of this Order or the matter will be remanded. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on January 25, 2022.(mp)
January 24, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed; State Farm Fire & Casualty Company served on 1/21/2022, answer due 2/11/2022. (Chopin, Justin)
January 21, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (jls)
January 20, 2022 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (ess)
January 20, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9190849) filed by Judy Gardebled. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Justin McCarthy Chopin added to party Estate if Judy Gardebled(pty:pla).(Chopin, Justin) Modified text on 1/21/2022 (jls).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gardebled v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate if Judy Gardebled
Represented By: Justin McCarthy Chopin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Gardebled
Represented By: Richard A Chopin
Represented By: Justin McCarthy Chopin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Represented By: David A. Strauss
Represented By: Marco Jose Salgado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?