Tisdale v. Marquette Transportation Company, LLC et al
Plaintiff: William Tisdale
Defendant: Marquette Transportation Company, Marquette Transportation Company Gulf-Inland, Marquette Transportation Co. Offshore, LLC, Marquette Transportation Company, LLC, Unidentified Parties and Marquette Transportation Company Gulf-Inland, LLC
Case Number: 2:2022cv00237
Filed: February 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Greg Gerard Guidry
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 30104 Marine Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2022 Filing 17 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #12 Summons Returned Executed, #11 Summons Returned Executed, #13 Summons Returned Executed. Document 11 is a duplicate filing of document 14. Document 12 is a duplicate filing of document 16. Document 13 is a duplicate filing of document 15. No further action is necessary. (lw)
March 24, 2022 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Marquette Transportation Co. Offshore, LLC served on 3/9/2022, answer due 3/30/2022. (LoCoco, Joseph) Modified text on 3/25/2022 (lw). (Main Document 16 replaced on 3/25/2022) (lw).
March 24, 2022 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Marquette Transportation Company Gulf-Inland, LLC served on 3/9/2022, answer due 3/30/2022. (LoCoco, Joseph) Modified text on 3/25/2022 (lw). (Main Document 15 replaced on 3/25/2022) (lw).
March 24, 2022 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Marquette Transportation Company, LLC served on 3/9/2022, answer due 3/30/2022. (LoCoco, Joseph) Modified text on 3/25/2022 (lw). (Main Document 14 replaced on 3/25/2022) (lw).
March 24, 2022 Filing 13 DUPLICATE: See doc. 15. SUMMONS Returned Executed; Marquette Transportation Company Gulf-Inland, LLC served on 3/9/2022, answer due 3/30/2022. (LoCoco, Joseph) Modified text on 3/25/2022 (lw).
March 24, 2022 Filing 12 DUPLICATE: See doc. 16. SUMMONS Returned Executed; Marquette Transportation Co. Offshore, LLC served on 3/9/2022, answer due 3/30/2022. (LoCoco, Joseph) Modified text on 3/25/2022 (lw).
March 24, 2022 Filing 11 DUPLICATE: See doc. 14. SUMMONS Returned Executed; Marquette Transportation Company, LLC served on 3/9/2022, answer due 3/30/2022. (LoCoco, Joseph) Modified text on 3/25/2022 (lw).
March 23, 2022 Filing 10 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #8 Summons Returned Executed. **This is a duplicate filing of document 7 and will be noted as such. No further action is necessary.** (mm)
March 22, 2022 Filing 9 DEFICIENT: SUMMONS Returned Executed; Marquette Transportation Co. Offshore, LLC served on 2/14/2022, answer due 3/7/2022. (LoCoco, Joseph) Modified text/answer due date on 3/23/2022 (mm).
March 22, 2022 Filing 8 **FILED IN ERROR-DUPLICATE FILING OF REC. DOC. 7** SUMMONS Returned Executed; Marquette Transportation Company Gulf-Inland, LLC served on 2/14/2022, answer due 3/7/2022. (LoCoco, Joseph) Modified text/answer due date on 3/23/2022 (mm).
March 22, 2022 Filing 7 DEFICIENT: SUMMONS Returned Executed; Marquette Transportation Company, LLC served on 2/14/2022, answer due 3/7/2022. (LoCoco, Joseph) Modified text/answer due date on 3/23/2022 (mm).
March 21, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Marquette Transportation Co. Offshore, LLC, Marquette Transportation Company Gulf-Inland, LLC, Marquette Transportation Company, LLC. Attorney Todd Gregory Crawford added to party Marquette Transportation Co. Offshore, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Gregory Crawford added to party Marquette Transportation Company Gulf-Inland, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Gregory Crawford added to party Marquette Transportation Company, LLC(pty:dft).(Crawford, Todd)
February 4, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Marquette Transportation Co. Offshore, LLC, Marquette Transportation Company Gulf-Inland, LLC, Marquette Transportation Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(lw)
February 4, 2022 Filing 4 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. Attachment has duplicate description. For attachment, select either a category OR enter a description, but not both since this results in duplicate text. Clerk took corrective action. Also, Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the Summons. The pdf should have been flattened. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click PRINT to adobe pdf to flatten the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. (lw)
February 4, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE Regarding Local Civil Rule 54.7. (lw)
February 3, 2022 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (aj)
February 3, 2022 Filing 1 SEAMAN COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Prepayment of fee not required pursuant to 28 USC 1916) filed by William Tisdale. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Marquette Transportation Company, #3 Summons to MTC-Gulf-Inland, #4 Summons to MTC-Offshore)Attorney Joseph Anthony LoCoco added to party William Tisdale(pty:pla).(LoCoco, Joseph) (Attachment 2 replaced on 2/4/2022) (lw). (Attachment 3 replaced on 2/4/2022) (lw). (Attachment 4 replaced on 2/4/2022) (lw). Modified text on 2/4/2022 (lw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tisdale v. Marquette Transportation Company, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Tisdale
Represented By: Joseph Anthony LoCoco
Represented By: Virginia Lynn LoCoco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marquette Transportation Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marquette Transportation Company Gulf-Inland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marquette Transportation Co. Offshore, LLC
Represented By: Todd Gregory Crawford
Represented By: Carter Lee Sayers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marquette Transportation Company, LLC
Represented By: Todd Gregory Crawford
Represented By: Carter Lee Sayers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marquette Transportation Company Gulf-Inland, LLC
Represented By: Todd Gregory Crawford
Represented By: Carter Lee Sayers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?