Clement et al v. Grange Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Monica Clement, Shane Clement and Hunter Clement
Defendant: Grange Insurance Company, Trustgard Insurance Company, Ronald Beach, Progressive Insurance Company and Progressive Security Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2022cv00666
Filed: March 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Ivan LR Lemelle
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Considering plaintiffs' motion to dismiss with prejudice (Rec. Doc. #15 ), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED, dismissing with prejudice all plaintiffs' claims against all defendants. Each party to bear their own attorney's fees and costs. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 11/22/2022. (dw)
November 22, 2022 Filing 15 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by Monica Clement, Shane Clement. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Stephen)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: IT IS ORDERED that the action be and is hereby dismissed without costs and without prejudice to the right, upon good cause shown, to reopen the action or to seek summary judgment enforcing the compromise if settlement is not consummated. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT ALL PENDING MOTIONS BETWEEN SETTLING PARTIES ARE DISMISSED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 11/14/2022.(pp)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/26/2023 at 11:00 AM before Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle. Jury Trial set for 2/6/2023 at 8:30 AM before Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle. All discovery must be completed by 12/27/2022. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 5/26/2022. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form) (dw) (NEF: Magistrate Judge)
May 26, 2022 Filing 12 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Trustgard Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Grange Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Grange Mutual Holding Company, Corporate Parent Grange Insurance Company for Trustgard Insurance Company (Hotard, Amy)
May 3, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 5/26/2022 at 9:30 AM before case manager by telephone. Parties are to call in to the conference at the number listed in the Notice. Issued by Clerk. (dw)
April 13, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Trustgard Insurance Company, and Ronald Beach.(Hotard, Amy) Modified text on 4/13/2022 (pp).
April 7, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Grange Insurance Company by Monica Clement, Shane Clement. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Manual Attachment Certificate of No Opposition)(Johnson, Stephen)
April 6, 2022 Filing 8 **DEFICIENT**NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without as to Grange Insurance Company by Monica Clement, Shane Clement. (Johnson, Stephen) Modified on 4/7/2022 (pp).
March 31, 2022 Filing 7 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #6 Notice of Compliance. **Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of 2. The pdf should not have the purple boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
March 30, 2022 Filing 6 Notice of Compliance re #2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Grange Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings, #2 Defendants' Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Hotard, Amy) Modified text/linkage on 3/31/2022 (jeg).
March 16, 2022 Filing 5 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #2 Notice of Removal.(pp)
March 15, 2022 Filing 4 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (aj)
March 15, 2022 Filing 3 **FILED IN ERROR- EXH. ATTACHED TO REC. DOC. 2**Amendment/Supplement to Document by Trustgard Insurance Company re #2 Notice (Other),, Exhibit E - Petition for Damages (England, Stephannie) Modified on 3/16/2022 (pp).
March 15, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Trustgard Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Service re Grange Insurance, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service re Trustgard Insurance, #3 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Service re Ronald Beach, #4 Exhibit D - Order of Partial Dismissal of Progressive Security, #5 Exhibit F - Email dated 2/15/2022 with attached medical records, #6 Exhibit G - State Court Record, #7 Verification, #8 Affidavit of Filing Notice of Removal in State Court, #9 Civil Cover Sheet with attachment)(England, Stephannie) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/16/2022) (pp). (Attachment 2 replaced on 3/16/2022) (pp). (Attachment 3 replaced on 3/16/2022) (pp). (Attachment 4 replaced on 3/16/2022) (pp). (Attachment 5 replaced on 3/16/2022) (pp). (Attachment 6 replaced on 3/16/2022) (pp). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/16/2022: #10 Exhibit E) (pp). Modified text on 3/16/2022 (pp).
March 15, 2022 Filing 1 **FILED IN ERROR- SEE REC DOC. 2**NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 17th Judicial District Court, Parish of Lafourche, case number 144126 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9274279) filed by Trustgard Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Service re Grange Insurance, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service re Trustgard Insurance, #3 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Service re Ronald Beach, #4 Exhibit D - Order of Partial Dismissal of Progressive Security, #5 Exhibit E - Petition for Damages, #6 Exhibit F - Email dated 02/15/2022 with attached medical records, #7 Exhibit G - State Court Record, #8 Verification, #9 Affidavit of Filing Notice of Removal in State Court, #10 Civil Cover Sheet with attachment)Attorney Stephannie Marie England added to party Trustgard Insurance Company(pty:dft).(England, Stephannie) Modified on 3/16/2022 (pp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clement et al v. Grange Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Clement
Represented By: Stephen J. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane Clement
Represented By: Stephen J. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hunter Clement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grange Insurance Company
Represented By: David P. Salley
Represented By: Amy Dunn Hotard
Represented By: Stephannie Marie England
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustgard Insurance Company
Represented By: Stephannie Marie England
Represented By: David P. Salley
Represented By: Amy Dunn Hotard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Beach
Represented By: David P. Salley
Represented By: Amy Dunn Hotard
Represented By: Stephannie Marie England
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Security Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?