Spikes v. Lancaster
Plaintiff: Jason J Spikes and Jason Jarrell Hughes
Defendant: Luke Lancaster
Consolidated Defendant: Raymond Childress, Iain Dover, John Linder, Warren Montgomery, Matthew Caplan, Walter Reed and Ronnie Gracianette
Case Number: 2:2022cv00741
Filed: March 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER that the Respondents motion is DENIED in part as unnecessary to the extent it seeks time to a file a response, which has already been filed #13 and GRANTED in part to allow Respondent an additional 21 days through 5/26/2022, to submit the state court trial and appellate records related to Washington Parish case number 14-CR8-126847, the only conviction being challenged in these consolidated habeas cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 5/9/2022. (Reference: ALL CASES)(caa)
May 6, 2022 Filing 16 EXPARTE/CONSENT First MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Petition Pursuant to 28:2241, #7 Habeas Corpus Response Order, by Matthew Caplan, Raymond Childress, Iain Dover, Ronnie Gracianette, Luke Lancaster, John Linder, Warren Montgomery, Walter Reed. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 22-741, 22-811, 22-812, 22-814, 22-917, 22-920)(Caplan, Matthew)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying #12 Motion for Leave to Adopt Previously-Filed State Court Record as the State Court Record in this Case. FURTHER ORDERED that on or before 5/19/2022, the Washington Parish District Attorney shall produce the complete record related to Washington Parish case 14-CR8-126847 in compliance with the Court's Superseding Briefing Order #7 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 4/28/2022. (Reference: ALL CASES)(caa)
April 27, 2022 Filing 14 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #12 MOTION adopt previously-filed state court record. **In Consolidated Matters, the caption must include a separate reference to list the case(s) to which the pleading pertains and the same case number(s) must be referenced in the docket entry. Please follow this requirement for all future filings.** (Reference: All Cases)(am)
April 26, 2022 Filing 13 Response to #1 Petition for Habeas Corpus Relief by Matthew Caplan, Raymond Childress, Iain Dover, Ronnie Gracianette, Luke Lancaster, John Linder, Warren Montgomery, Walter Reed.(Reference: All Cases)(Caplan, Matthew) Modified text on 4/27/2022 (am).
April 26, 2022 Filing 12 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION adopt previously-filed state court record by Matthew Caplan, Raymond Childress, Iain Dover, Ronnie Gracianette, Luke Lancaster, John Linder, Warren Montgomery, Walter Reed. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: All Cases)Attorney Matthew Caplan added to party Matthew Caplan(pty:condft), Attorney Matthew Caplan added to party Raymond Childress(pty:condft), Attorney Matthew Caplan added to party Iain Dover(pty:condft), Attorney Matthew Caplan added to party Ronnie Gracianette(pty:condft), Attorney Matthew Caplan added to party Luke Lancaster(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Caplan added to party John Linder(pty:condft), Attorney Matthew Caplan added to party Warren Montgomery(pty:condft), Attorney Matthew Caplan added to party Walter Reed(pty:condft).(Caplan, Matthew) Modified text on 4/27/2022 (am).
April 21, 2022 Filing 18 Return of Service of Habeas Corpus Response Order served on Attorney General's Office, Criminal Division on 4/4/2022.(Reference: 22-812)(pp)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Habeas Corpus Response Order that Attorney General for the State of Louisiana and the District Attorney for Washington Parish respond to the petition of Habeas Corpus within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 4/13/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipts sent to Clerk, D.A., Attorney General)(Reference: 22-0917, 22-0920)(caa)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that 22-917 and 22-920 are hereby CONSOLIDATED with 22-741. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these matters are now REFERRED as part of the master case. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 04/13/2022.(Reference: 22-917, -22-920)(am) Modified on 4/13/2022 (sa).
April 7, 2022 Filing 9 Return of Service of Habeas Corpus Response Order served on 22nd JDC Clerk. (Reference: 22-812)(pp)
April 7, 2022 Filing 8 Return of Service of Habeas Corpus Response Order served on LA Department of Justice, Attorney General's Office and 22nd JDC Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Return)(Reference: All Cases)(pp)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUPERSEDING Habeas Corpus Response Order that Attorney General for the State of Louisiana and the District Attorney for Washington Parish respond to the petition of Habeas Corpus within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 4/6/2022.(Reference: All Cases)(jeg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/6/2022: #1 Certified Mail Receipts) (jeg).
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 4/5/2022. (NEF: Mag. 4) (Reference: 22-741, 22-811, 22-812, 22-814)(sa)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that 22-811, 22-812 and 22-814 are hereby CONSOLIDATED with 22-741. Pursuant to the Court's directive, all documents hereafter, including those referring to the member case, shall bear the caption of the lead case (22-741) together with the docket number(s) of all cases within the consolidation. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 4/5/2022.(sa)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Habeas Corpus Response Order that Attorney General for the State of Louisiana and the District Attorney for Washington Parish Parish respond to the petition of Habeas Corpus within 30 days. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 3/30/2022.(jeg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/31/2022: #1 Certified Mail Receipts) (jeg).
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 3/23/2022. (jeg)
March 21, 2022 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jason J Spikes. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (js)
March 21, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION Pursuant to 28:2241 filed by Jason J Spikes.(Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(js)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spikes v. Lancaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason J Spikes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Jarrell Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luke Lancaster
Represented By: Matthew Caplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Raymond Childress
Represented By: Matthew Caplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Iain Dover
Represented By: Matthew Caplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: John Linder
Represented By: Matthew Caplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Warren Montgomery
Represented By: Matthew Caplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Matthew Caplan
Represented By: Matthew Caplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Walter Reed
Represented By: Matthew Caplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Ronnie Gracianette
Represented By: Matthew Caplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?