Magee v. Florida Marine, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Nicholas Reed Magee
Defendant: Florida Marine, LLC and PBC Management, LLC
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Florida Marine Transporters, LLC
3Rd Party Defendant: McNational, Inc. doing business as Mid America Fuels, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2022cv03835
Filed: October 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Michael North
Referring Judge: Jay C Zainey
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 30104 Marine Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Summons Issued as to McNational, Inc. (js)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #9 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint. Name of attorney who electronically filed this document does not match name of signatory attorney on pleading or in signature block. The user log-in and password serve as the required signature for purposes of Rule 11 of the FRCP. Filing attorney is not enrolled in this case. A Motion to Enroll is necessary. (js)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against McNational, Inc. by PBC Management, LLC, Florida Marine Transporters, LLC, Florida Marine, LLC.Attorney Lee M. Rudin added to party Florida Marine Transporters, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Lee M. Rudin added to party Florida Marine, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Lee M. Rudin added to party PBC Management, LLC(pty:dft).(Rudin, Lee)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion to Enroll as Additional Counsel of Record. IT IS ORDERED that Taylor M. Bologna, of the law office of Huber Thomas, LLP, be and is hereby enrolled as additional counsel of record for Plaintiff in the above captioned matter. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 11/7/2022. (pp)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record Taylor Bologna by Nicholas Reed Magee. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Davis, Adam)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed; PBC Management, LLC served on 10/14/2022, answer due 11/4/2022. (Davis, Adam)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Florida Marine, LLC served on 10/14/2022, answer due 11/4/2022. (Davis, Adam)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Florida Marine Transporters, LLC served on 10/14/2022, answer due 11/4/2022. (Davis, Adam)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Florida Marine Transporters, LLC, Florida Marine, LLC, PBC Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Florida Marine Transporters, LLC, #2 Summons PBC Management, LLC)(js)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (ess)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 SEAMAN COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9601396) filed by Nicholas Reed Magee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Florida Marine, LLC, #3 Summons Florida Marine Transporters, LLC, #4 Summons PBC Management, LLC)Attorney Adam N. Davis added to party Nicholas Reed Magee(pty:pla).(Davis, Adam) Modified text on 10/13/2022 (js).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Magee v. Florida Marine, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Reed Magee
Represented By: Adam N. Davis
Represented By: Taylor Michael Bologna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida Marine, LLC
Represented By: Anthony John Staines
Represented By: Corey Patrick Parenton
Represented By: Jason R. Kenney
Represented By: Jessica Bankston Finley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PBC Management, LLC
Represented By: Anthony John Staines
Represented By: Corey Patrick Parenton
Represented By: Jason R. Kenney
Represented By: Jessica Bankston Finley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Florida Marine Transporters, LLC
Represented By: Anthony John Staines
Represented By: Corey Patrick Parenton
Represented By: Jessica Bankston Finley
Represented By: Jason R. Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: McNational, Inc. doing business as Mid America Fuels, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?