Kelson v. Kenner Housing Authority et al
Plaintiff: Jeanette A Kelson
Defendant: Kenner Housing Authority, Barry Bordelon, Elisha Barnes and Unidentified Party
Case Number: 2:2022cv03872
Filed: October 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Carl Barbier
Referring Judge: Dana Douglas
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER - Considering Plaintiff's Motion to Approve Consent Judgment (Rec. Doc. 12), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED, and the appended Consent Judgment on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Rec. Doc. 2) is APPROVED. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 11/8/22.(cg)
November 9, 2022 Filing 14 CONSENT JUDGMENT in Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 11/9/22.(cg)
November 9, 2022 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Elisha Barnes served on 11/1/2022, answer due 11/22/2022; Barry Bordelon served on 11/1/2022, answer due 11/22/2022; Kenner Housing Authority served on 11/1/2022, answer due 11/22/2022. (Attachments: #1 Summons Return Executed, #2 Summons Return Executed)(Adams, Hannah)
November 8, 2022 Filing 12 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment by Jeanette A Kelson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Signed consent judgment, #2 Proposed Order)(Adams, Hannah) Modified on 11/9/2022 (gec).
October 28, 2022 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Elisha Barnes, Barry Bordelon, Kenner Housing Authority. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(cg)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 10/28/22. (cg)
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Continue. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED, and that the hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Rec. Doc. 2) currently scheduled for October 24th, 2022 is hereby continued to November 9th, 2022 at 9:30 a.m. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Kenner Housing Authority continue Jeanette Kelson's Section 8 voucher subsidy until disposition of the preliminary injunction. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Kenner Housing Authority issue a November Housing Assistance Payment to Ms. Kelson's landlord. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 10/20/22. (cg)
October 18, 2022 Filing 8 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue by Jeanette A Kelson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Adams, Hannah)
October 14, 2022 Filing 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Carl Barbier: Status Conference held on 10/14/2022. At the conference, the Court deferred ruling on Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order (Rec. Doc. 2) in light of assurances made by the representative for Kenner Housing Authority that no adverse actions will occur or be taken against Plaintiff, Jeanette Kelson until a hearing is held on this matter. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a hearing be held on October 24th, 2022 at 9:30 a.m. on Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. (Rec. Doc. 2). (cg)(CC: Robert Garrity-Via email at roberttgarrityjr@bellsouth.net)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a telephone status conference in this matter is set for Friday, October 14, 2022 at 2:30 p.m. Counsel for Plaintiff is instructed to give notice of this conference to Kenner Housing Authority and its representatives. Counsel for Plaintiff will begin the conference call and, once representatives for Defendant is on the line, add the Court to the call by dialing 504-589-7525. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 10/14/22.(cg)
October 14, 2022 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. The Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis should have been filed as a separate document and not with the complaint. Clerk took corrective actions and filed it separately. No further action is needed. (cg)
October 14, 2022 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jeanette A Kelson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Pauper Application, #3 Proposed Order)(cg) Modified referral on 10/14/2022 (cg).
October 13, 2022 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (ess)
October 13, 2022 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Jeanette A Kelson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Certificate of Notice, #4 Proposed Order Proposed TRO, #5 Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order)(Adams, Hannah)
October 13, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (In Forma Pauperis status requested) filed by Jeanette A Kelson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons to KHA, #3 Summons Summons to Barry Bordelon, #4 Summons Summons to Elisha Barnes, #5 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #6 Memo in Support of In Forma Pauperis Motion, #7 Exhibit Exhibit A to IFP Memo, #8 Proposed Order Proposed IFP Order)Attorney Hannah Draper Adams added to party Jeanette A Kelson(pty:pla).(Adams, Hannah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelson v. Kenner Housing Authority et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanette A Kelson
Represented By: Hannah Draper Adams
Represented By: David Holman Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenner Housing Authority
Represented By: Robert T. Garrity, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Bordelon
Represented By: Robert T. Garrity, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elisha Barnes
Represented By: Robert T. Garrity, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?