Gorski et al v. Janssen Research & Development LLC et al
Plaintiff: Keiko Gorski and Florian Gorski
Defendant: Janssen Research & Development LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson and Johnson Pharmaceutical Research and Development LLC, Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceutica Products, L.P., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Company, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc., Bayer Pharma AG, Bayer Corporation, Bayer HealthCare AG, Bayer Healthcare LLC, Bayer AG and Johnson & Johnson Pharmaceutical Research and Development, LLC
Case Number: 2:2022cv04331
Filed: November 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Eldon E Fallon
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2022 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(lag)
December 23, 2022 Filing 14 Request of Summons Issued as to Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson Company filed by Florian Gorski, Keiko Gorski re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Summons Alias, Janssen research, #2 Summons Alias Janssen Pharma Inc, #3 Summons Alias Janssen Pharmaceuticals, #4 Summons Alias J&J Co)(Schulman, Bradley)
December 23, 2022 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc., Bayer Pharma AG. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(lag)
December 22, 2022 Filing 12 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Attachments: #1 Summons Alias, SOP Dept, #2 Summons Alias, Bayer HealthCare, #3 Summons Alias, Bayer Pharma AG)(Schulman, Bradley)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon.(my)
November 1, 2022 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:22-cv-03481. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received (my)
October 27, 2022 Filing 9 TRANSFERRED to the the Eastern District of Louisiana the electronic record. (daj, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/1/2022.]
October 27, 2022 Filing 8 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from MDL Panel transferring case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana. Signed by the Unassigned on 10/27/2022: Mailed notice (daj, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/1/2022.]
October 27, 2022 ***Civil Case Terminated. (daj, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/1/2022.]
October 26, 2022 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Telephone Conference set for 11/2/22 is re-set to 2/23/23 at 9:00 a.m. Joint status report shall be filed by 2/15/23. Dial: 888-684-8852 or 215-446-0155, access code: 9582710#. Mailed notice (maf) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/1/2022.]
October 24, 2022 Filing 6 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Janssen Research & Development LLC f/k/a Johnson and Johnson Pharmaceutical Research and Development, LLC (Essig, William) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/1/2022.]
October 24, 2022 Filing 5 Letter to the Court by Janssen Research & Development LLC f/k/a Johnson and Johnson Pharmaceutical Research and Development, LLC (Essig, William) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/1/2022.]
October 24, 2022 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Janssen Research & Development LLC f/k/a Johnson and Johnson Pharmaceutical Research and Development, LLC by William Victor Essig (Essig, William) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/1/2022.]
October 18, 2022 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendants Bayer Corporation, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (dxb, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/1/2022.]
August 30, 2022 Filing 3 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Telephonic status conference set for 9/8/22 is re-set to 11/2/22 at 9:00 a.m. Joint status report shall be filed by 10/24/22. Dial: 888-684-8852 or 215-446-0155, access code: 9582710#. Mailed notice (maf) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/1/2022.]
August 25, 2022 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Bayer Corporation, Bayer Healthcare AG, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer Pharma AG, Janssen Ortho, LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., f/k/a Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. f/k/a Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC f/k/a Johnson and Johnson Pharmaceutical Research and Development, LLC, Johnson & Johnson Company (smb, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/1/2022.]
July 13, 2022 Filing 2 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Telephonic status conference set for 9/8/22 at 9:15 a.m. Joint status report shall be filed by 9/2/22. Dial: 888-684-8852 or 215-446-0155, access code: 9582710#. Mailed notice (maf) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/1/2022.]
July 6, 2022 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (emc, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/1/2022.]
July 6, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (emc, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/1/2022.]
July 5, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Florian Gorski, Keiko Gorski; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-19622534. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schulman, Bradley) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/1/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gorski et al v. Janssen Research & Development LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Research & Development LLC
Represented By: William V. Essig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson and Johnson Pharmaceutical Research and Development LLC
Represented By: William V. Essig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Ortho LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Products, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Pharma AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer HealthCare AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Healthcare LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Pharmaceutical Research and Development, LLC
Represented By: William V. Essig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keiko Gorski
Represented By: Bradley Z. Schulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florian Gorski
Represented By: Bradley Z. Schulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?