James et al v. Tangipahoa Parish
Plaintiff: Jason A James, Christopher Leon Norris, Kevin Joseph Stogner, Jason Allen James, JJ, Leon Norris and Kevin Stogner
Defendant: Tangipahoa Parish
Case Number: 2:2022cv05233
Filed: December 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Nannette Jolivette Brown
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/21/2023 at 3:00 PM before Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown. Bench Trial set for 10/16/2023 at 9:00 AM before Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown. All discovery must be completed by 8/17/2023. Issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form, #2 Standing Order)(dw)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDERED that Plaintiffs' #15 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Briefing and #16 Motion to Expedite are MOOT. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/21/2022. (jls)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DENYING #6 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, as set forth herein. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/21/2022. (jls)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Request for Leave of Court to consider Supplemental Briefing by Jason Allen James, Leon Norris, Kevin Stogner. Motion(s) will be submitted on 1/11/2023. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Notice of Submission)(Adcock, John)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to File Supplement Brief in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Jason Allen James, Leon Norris, Kevin Stogner. Motion(s) will be submitted on 1/11/2023. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Pleading, #3 Notice of Submission, #4 Proposed Order)(Adcock, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/21/2022: #5 Proposed Pleading - Exhibit A, #6 Proposed Pleading - Exhibit B) (jls).
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 1/17/2023 at 2:00 PM before case manager by telephone. Counsel and pro se parties must call in to the conference at 1-888-278-0296, Access Code: 6243426. Issued by Clerk. (dw)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Defendants re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Moody, Christopher)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ANSWER to #10 First Amended Complaint , by Tangipahoa Parish. Attorney Christopher M. Moody added to party Tangipahoa Parish(pty:dft).(Moody, Christopher) Modified text on 12/16/2022 (jls).
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Supplemental Memorandum filed by All Plaintiffs, in In Support of #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Watson, Sarah)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Kevin Stogner, Leon Norris, Jason Allen James.(Watson, Sarah) Modified text, removed jury demand on 12/16/2022 (jls).
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs are granted leave to submit additional briefing in support of their "Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction" by December 15, 2022 at 3:00 PM. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant is granted leave to file any opposition to Plaintiffs' motion by December 16, 2022 at 12:00 PM. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/14/2022. (dw)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown: Conference held on 12/14/2022. The Court met with counsel to discuss Plaintiffs' "Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction." The Court heard arguments regarding whether the Anti-Injunction Act prevented the Court from granting the motion. Thereafter, the Court granted Plaintiffs leave to submit additional briefing by December 15, 2022 at 3:00 PM. The Court granted Defendant leave to file any opposition to Plaintiffs' motion by December 16, 2022 at 12:00 PM. (Court Reporter Jodi Simcox.) (dw)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Filing attorney selected incorrect submission/hearing date. Correct date is 12/28/2022. Clerk took corrective action. (cwa)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Jason Allen James, Leon Norris, Kevin Stogner. Motion(s) will be submitted on 12/28/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Submission, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit List, #4 Exhibit A - Tangipahoa Parish Council, LA Code of Ordinances_Sober Living Houses, #5 Exhibit B - Letter to Mark and Melissa Robertson, #6 Exhibit C- Amanda Warner's Correspondance with the Tangipahoa Parish Planning Department, #7 Exhibit D -Petition for Preliminary Injunctive and Other Relief, #8 Exhibit E- Reasonable Accommodation Request, #9 Exhibit F- Reasonable Accommodation Request to OSFM, #10 Exhibit G- OSFM's Reasonable Accommodation Approval, #11 Exhibit Declaration of Amanda Warner)(Watson, Sarah) Modified text/submission date on 12/14/2022 (cwa).
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #2 Summons Submitted for Issuance. Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the Summons. The pdf should not have the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. (cs)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Tangipahoa Parish. (cs)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (ess)
December 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Adcock, John)
December 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Tangipahoa Parish (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9696050) filed by Jason A James, Kevin Joseph Stogner, Christopher Leon Norris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney John Nelson Adcock added to party Jason A James(pty:pla), Attorney John Nelson Adcock added to party Christopher Leon Norris(pty:pla), Attorney John Nelson Adcock added to party Kevin Joseph Stogner(pty:pla).(Adcock, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James et al v. Tangipahoa Parish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason A James
Represented By: John Nelson Adcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Leon Norris
Represented By: John Nelson Adcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Joseph Stogner
Represented By: John Nelson Adcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Allen James
Represented By: Jodi De'Shae Hill
Represented By: Sarah Watson
Represented By: John Nelson Adcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JJ
Represented By: Sarah Watson
Represented By: Jodi De'Shae Hill
Represented By: John Nelson Adcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leon Norris
Represented By: Jodi De'Shae Hill
Represented By: Sarah Watson
Represented By: John Nelson Adcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Stogner
Represented By: Sarah Watson
Represented By: Jodi De'Shae Hill
Represented By: John Nelson Adcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tangipahoa Parish
Represented By: Christopher M. Moody
Represented By: Albert David Giraud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?