Gordon v. New Orleans City et al
Plaintiff: Kendale Gordon
Defendant: City of New Orleans, Barrett Morton, Orlando Mathews, Gregory Johnson, Daniel McMullen, Ryan Aucoin, Gregory Hamilton, Desmond Pratt, Arthur Kaufman, Lasalle Rattler, Tyrone Robinson, Chris Robert, Juan Lopez, Phil Burras, Quincy Broaden, Sr, Nate Addison, Glen Hewitt, Jason McGee, Ananie Mitchell, Melvin McCullum, Thomas Evans, John Kesler, Marlon Defillo, S Richard, A Deshotel, N Adams, Unknown Insurance Companies, S. Richard, Unidentified Parties, New Orleans City, Barret Morton and Quincy Broaden
Case Number: 2:2022cv05297
Filed: December 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Referring Judge: Jay C Zainey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint, as to New Orleans City answer due 2/15/2023. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 1/26/2023. (mmm)
January 25, 2023 Filing 15 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by New Orleans City. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney William Rembert Henry Goforth added to party New Orleans City(pty:dft).(Goforth, William)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Thomas R. Kayes. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 01/23/2023. (Attachments: #1 PHV Notice) (js)
January 20, 2023 Filing 13 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thomas R. Kayes (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-9761001) by Kendale Gordon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Proposed Order)(Arteaga, Mario) Modified text on 1/23/2023 (js).
January 20, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed; New Orleans City served on 1/4/2023, answer due 1/25/2023. (Leff, Alison)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Alison R. Leff. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 1/19/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice PHV) (mmm)
January 18, 2023 Filing 10 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Alison R. Leff (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-9757286) by Kendale Gordon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Proposed Order)(Arteaga, Mario) Modified text/referral on 1/19/2023 (js).
December 20, 2022 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to N Adams, Nate Addison, Ryan Aucoin, Quincy Broaden, Phil Burras, Marlon Defillo, A Deshotel, Thomas Evans, Gregory Hamilton, Glen Hewitt, Gregory Johnson, Arthur Kaufman, John Kesler, Juan Lopez, Orlando Mathews, Melvin McCullum, Jason McGee, Daniel McMullen, Ananie Mitchell, Barret Morton, Desmond Pratt, Lasalle Rattler, S Richard, Chris Robert, Tyrone Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons, #22 Summons, #23 Summons, #24 Summons)(js)
December 19, 2022 Filing 8 DEFICIENT EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-9708209) by Kendale Gordon. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (Attachments: #1 Statement, #2 Statement, #3 Proposed Order)(Arteaga, Mario) Modified on 12/20/2022 (cs).
December 19, 2022 Filing 7 DEFICIENT EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-9707840) by Kendale Gordon. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (Attachments: #1 Statement, #2 Statement, #3 Proposed Order)(Arteaga, Mario) Modified on 12/20/2022 (cs).
December 19, 2022 Filing 6 Request of Summons Issued as to N Adams, Nate Addison, Ryan Aucoin, Quincy Broaden, Phil Burras, Marlon Defillo, A Deshotel, Thomas Evans, Gregory Hamilton, Glen Hewitt, Gregory Johnson, Arthur Kaufman, John Kesler, Juan Lopez, Orlando Mathews, Melvin McCullum, Jason McGee, Daniel McMullen, Ananie Mitchell, Barret Morton, New Orleans City, Desmond Pratt, Lasalle Rattler, S Richard, Chris Robert, Tyrone Robinson filed by All Plaintiffs re #1 Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons, #22 Summons, #23 Summons, #24 Summons)(Arteaga, Mario)
December 16, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to New Orleans City. (js)
December 16, 2022 Filing 4 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #3 Request for Summons Issued. Summons form should only be addressed to one individually named defendant per form. Please submit a summons for each named defendant. (js)
December 15, 2022 Filing 3 Request of Summons Issued as to City of New Orleans filed by All Plaintiffs re #1 Complaint,. (Arteaga, Mario)
December 15, 2022 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (mb)
December 15, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9704008) filed by Kendale Gordon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Mario A. Arteaga added to party Kendale Gordon(pty:pla).(Arteaga, Mario)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gordon v. New Orleans City et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendale Gordon
Represented By: Mario A. Arteaga
Represented By: Leo J Palazzo
Represented By: Alison R. Leff
Represented By: Thomas R. Kayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New Orleans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barrett Morton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orlando Mathews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel McMullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Aucoin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Desmond Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lasalle Rattler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyrone Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Robert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phil Burras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quincy Broaden, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nate Addison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glen Hewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason McGee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ananie Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melvin McCullum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kesler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marlon Defillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Richard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Deshotel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Insurance Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Richard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Orleans City
Represented By: William Rembert Henry Goforth
Represented By: Corwin St. Raymond
Represented By: Donesia D. Turner
Represented By: Renee E. Goudeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barret Morton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quincy Broaden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?