Hammond et al v. U.S. Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms And Explosives, et al
Plaintiff: Lavell Hammond and Carolyn Hammond
Defendant: U.S. Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms And Explosives and Unidentified Parties
Case Number: 2:2023cv00986
Filed: March 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Ivan LR Lemelle
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346 Tort Claim
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to U.S. Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms And Explosives. (pp)
May 9, 2023 Filing 3 Request of Summons Issued as to U.S. Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms And Explosives filed by Lavell Hammond, Carolyn Hammond re #1 Complaint,. (Keelen, Raynique)
March 21, 2023 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (ess)
March 20, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against U.S. Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms And Explosives (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9855620) filed by Lavell Hammond, Carolyn Hammond. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Raynique Trenice Keelen added to party Carolyn Hammond(pty:pla), Attorney Raynique Trenice Keelen added to party Lavell Hammond(pty:pla).(Keelen, Raynique)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hammond et al v. U.S. Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms And Explosives, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lavell Hammond
Represented By: Raynique Trenice Keelen
Represented By: John T. Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Hammond
Represented By: Raynique Trenice Keelen
Represented By: John T. Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms And Explosives
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?