Inclusive Louisiana et al v. St. James Parish et al
Plaintiff: Inclusive Louisiana, Mount Triumph Baptist Church and RISE St. James
Defendant: St. James Parish, st. james parish council and St. James parish planning commission
Case Number: 2:2023cv00987
Filed: March 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Referring Judge: Wendy B Vitter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Notice of Related Case(s) by All Plaintiffs. (Lowell, Devin)
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) granting #14 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Clara J. Potter be enrolled as additional counsel of record for Plaintiff Rise St. James in the above-captioned matter. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 5/4/2023. (ctc)
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #14 MOTION to Enroll Additional Counsel Clara J. Potter. **Document contains incorrect Section and Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Section D, Judge Wendy Vitter and Division 1, Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld.** (mmv)
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll Additional Counsel Clara J. Potter by RISE St. James. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lowell, Devin) Modified text on 5/4/2023 (mmv).
April 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint,, as to St. James Parish answer due 6/16/2023; St. James Parish Council answer due 6/16/2023; St. James Parish Planning Commission answer due 6/16/2023. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Defendants shall have until June 16, 2023 to file any responsive pleadings in this matter. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 4/27/2023. (ctc)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint by St. James Parish, St. James Parish Council, St. James Parish Planning Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Attorney Carroll Devillier, Jr added to party St. James Parish(pty:dft), Attorney Carroll Devillier, Jr added to party St. James Parish Council(pty:dft), Attorney Carroll Devillier, Jr added to party St. James Parish Planning Commission(pty:dft).(Devillier, Carroll) Modified text on 4/26/2023 (mmv).
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the #9 , #10 Motions are GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Astha Sharma Pokharel and Sadaf Doost be granted pro hac vice admission and be permitted to appear as additional counsel of record for all purposes on behalf of Plaintiffs Inclusive Louisiana and Mount Triumph Baptist Church in the above-captioned case. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 4/11/2023. (mmv)
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Sadaf Doost (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number BLAEDC-9887723) by Inclusive Louisiana, Mount Triumph Baptist Church. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit w Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Consent to Electronic Filing, #3 Proposed Order)(Spees, Pamela) Modified text on 4/10/2023 (mmv).
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Astha Sharma Pokharel (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-9887707) by Inclusive Louisiana, Mount Triumph Baptist Church. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Proposed Order)(Spees, Pamela)
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Summons Issued as to St. James Parish, St. James Parish Council, St. James Parish Planning Commission. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(mmv)
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #4 , #5 , and #6 Summons Submitted for Issuance. **1) Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the Summons. The pdfs should not have the pink header nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. **2) Document does not contain the Section and Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Section D, Judge Wendy B. Vitter and Division 1, Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld.**(mmv)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Spees, Pamela) (Main Document 6 replaced on 3/27/2023) (mmv).
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Spees, Pamela) (Main Document 5 replaced on 3/27/2023) (mmv).
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Spees, Pamela) (Main Document 4 replaced on 3/27/2023) (mmv).
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 **DEFICIENT** Summons Submitted for Issuance (Attachments: #1 Supplement Attachment w Plaintiffs Attorney Contact Info)(Spees, Pamela) (Main Document 3 replaced on 3/22/2023) (js). Modified on 3/24/2023 (mmv).
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Wendy B Vitter and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (ess)
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9855800) filed by Inclusive Louisiana, RISE St. James, Mount Triumph Baptist Church. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit Introduction to Student Attorneys)Attorney Pamela Carol Spees added to party Inclusive Louisiana(pty:pla), Attorney Pamela Carol Spees added to party Mount Triumph Baptist Church(pty:pla), Attorney Pamela Carol Spees added to party RISE St. James(pty:pla).(Spees, Pamela) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/22/2023) (js).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Inclusive Louisiana et al v. St. James Parish et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inclusive Louisiana
Represented By: Pamela Carol Spees
Represented By: Astha Sharma Pokharel
Represented By: Sadaf Doost
Represented By: William Patrick Quigley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mount Triumph Baptist Church
Represented By: Pamela Carol Spees
Represented By: Astha Sharma Pokharel
Represented By: Sadaf Doost
Represented By: William Patrick Quigley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RISE St. James
Represented By: Pamela Carol Spees
Represented By: Devin A. Lowell
Represented By: Allie A. Hingle
Represented By: Clara Joyce Potter
Represented By: Edith D. Hanly
Represented By: Lauren E. Godshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. James Parish
Represented By: John Baird King
Represented By: Carroll Devillier, Jr.
Represented By: Danielle Lauren Borel
Represented By: Thomas R. Temple, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: st. james parish council
Represented By: Danielle Lauren Borel
Represented By: John Baird King
Represented By: Carroll Devillier, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas R. Temple, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. James parish planning commission
Represented By: John Baird King
Represented By: Carroll Devillier, Jr.
Represented By: Danielle Lauren Borel
Represented By: Thomas R. Temple, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?